Modi et al v. United Airlines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: MITUL MODI and STEVEN HOWARD
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc., UNITED TECHNICAL OPERATIONS, Doe Passenger 1 and Does 2-25, inclusive
Case Number: 4:2021cv05546
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by STEVEN HOWARD, MITUL MODI.. (Wu, Annie) (Filed on 8/18/2021)
August 18, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United Airlines, Inc... (Mikha Pardasani, Natasha) (Filed on 8/18/2021)
August 4, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT UNITED AIRLINES, INC. Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs and defendant United Airlines, Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/18/2021. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2021)
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United Airlines, Inc. re #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #1 Notice of Removal, (Mikha Pardasani, Natasha) (Filed on 7/22/2021)
July 22, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/12/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2021)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/3/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by United Airlines, Inc. Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (Mikha Pardasani, Natasha) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by United Airlines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Airlines Holdings, Inc. for United Airlines, Inc.. (Mikha Pardasani, Natasha) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of San Francisco. Their case number is CGC-21-589788. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16195681). Filed byUnited Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mikha Pardasani, Natasha) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
July 20, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Please resubmit current Civil Cover Sheet Rev.10/20. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Even ts > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by United Airlines, Inc. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Modi et al v. United Airlines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MITUL MODI
Represented By: Anthony Lawrence Label
Represented By: Annie C Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN HOWARD
Represented By: Anthony Lawrence Label
Represented By: Annie C Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Natasha Mikha Pardasani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED TECHNICAL OPERATIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Passenger 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 2-25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?