Elorreaga et al v. ABB, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Roberto Elorreaga and Rosemary Elorreaga
Defendant: ABB, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., ITT Corporation, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Rockwell Automation, Inc., ITE Circuit Breaker Company, Armstrong International Inc., Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc. doing business as Weir Valves and Controls USA, Inc., A.W. Chesterton Company, Inc., Carrier Corporation, Crown, Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Eaton Corporation, Ericsson, Inc., FMC Corporation, Goulds Pumps LLC, Greene, Tweed & Co., Hill Brothers Chemical Company, IMO Delaval Inc., International Paper Company, ITT Industries, Inc., J.T. Thorpe & Sons, Inc., MetalClad Insulation LLC, Hookers Chemical Co., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Plastics Engineering Company doing business as Plenco, Rogers Corporation, RSCC Wire & Cable, LLC, Schneider Electric USA Inc., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Union Carbide Corporation, York International Corporation, ViacomCBS Inc., General Electric Company, Crane Co., Johnson Controls, Inc., Crosby Valve, LLC, sued as Doe 13, Warren Pumps, LLC, Foster Wheeler LLC and Rockwell Automation, Inc., f/k/a Rockwell International, sued as Doe 19
Case Number: 4:2021cv05696
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT AND INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Rosemary Elorreaga. (Gold, Roger) (Filed on 10/19/2021)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Notification of Death of Party Roberto Elorreaga by Roberto Elorreaga, Rosemary Elorreaga (Gold, Roger) (Filed on 10/12/2021) Modified on 10/13/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS Inc. f/k/a CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 10/6/2021)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Soriano, Jocelyn) (Filed on 10/6/2021)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #51 Stipulation Dismissal of All Claims Against Defendant (Doe 19) Rockwell Automation, Inc. f/k/a Rockwell International (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Reliance Electric Co.). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2021)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissal of All Claims Against Defendant (Doe 19) Rockwell Automation, Inc. f/k/a Rockwell International (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Reliance Electric Co.) filed by Rockwell Automation, Inc., f/k/a Rockwell International, sued as Doe 19. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 10/5/2021)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Duffy, Joseph) (Filed on 10/5/2021)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Foster Wheeler LLC.. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Certificate of Interested Entities by Foster Wheeler LLC identifying Corporate Parent Amec Foster Wheeler plc, a publicly traded company for Foster Wheeler LLC. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Park, Charles) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles S. Park (Park, Charles) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byFoster Wheeler LLC. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE by FMC Corporation of Withdrawal of Counsel, Sandra L. Gryder (Gryder, Sandra) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING #43 Stipulation Authorizing Electronic Service Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/21/2021. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] Re: #43 Stipulation filed by Rosemary Elorreaga, Roberto Elorreaga. For future filing the correct event is Civil> Mo tions and Related Filings> Stipulations> Stipulation and Proposed Order. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Authorizing Electronic Service filed by Roberto Elorreaga, Rosemary Elorreaga. (Gold, Roger) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 CLERK'S NOTICE RE DOCKET NO. 23 . Notice is hereby given that the case management conference set for October 26, 2021 will be held telephonically. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2021)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #40 Stipulation FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2021)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant FMC Corporation filed by FMC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gryder, Sandra) (Filed on 9/13/2021)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra Lucia Gryder on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation (Gryder, Sandra) (Filed on 9/13/2021)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Notice of Filing State Court Answer ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byWarren Pumps, LLC. (Cunningham, James) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Filing State Court Answer by Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 8/4/2021) Modified on 8/5/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Livingston Sharp (Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 8/3/2021)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary David Sharp on behalf of Crosby Valve, LLC (Sharp, Gary) (Filed on 8/3/2021)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Notice of Filing of State Court Answer to Complaint by Johnson Controls, Inc. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 8/3/2021) Modified on 8/4/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Johnson Controls, Inc... (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 8/3/2021)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson Controls, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 8/3/2021)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Certificate of Interested Entities by Johnson Controls, Inc. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 8/3/2021)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. NOTICE: Counsels (Gary D. Sharp and Andrew L. Sharp) must file their own Notice of Appearance using their own ECF Profiles to appear on the docket. Re:[29 ] Notice of Appearance filed by Crosby Valve, LLC, sued as Doe 13 (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2021)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Crosby Valve, LLC, sued as Doe 13 identifying Corporate Parent J.R. Clarkson Company LLC, Corporate Parent Emerson Electric Co. for Crosby Valve, LLC, sued as Doe 13. (Soriano, Jocelyn) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Jocelyn Mislang Soriano (Soriano, Jocelyn) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Request for Jury Trial byCrosby Valve, LLC, sued as Doe 13. (Soriano, Jocelyn) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Jo Talarico as Counsel for Johnson Controls, Inc. (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Duffy as Counsel for Johnson Controls, Inc. (Duffy, Joseph) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Renee Chaves (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for October 26, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by October 19th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-05696-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2021)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error.REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Incorrect Event Used. In the future, the correct event is Joinder. Correct event is found under Civil Events > Other Filing s > Other Documents. [err101] Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #4 MOTION for Joinder filed by ViacomCBS Inc. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2021)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Demand for Jury Trial byViacomCBS Inc.. (Empting, Erin) (Filed on 7/28/2021)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by General Electric Company (Gardiner, Katherine) (Filed on 7/28/2021)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Crane Co. identifying Other Affiliate Hartford, Other Affiliate American Home Assurance Company, Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, Other Affiliate Highlands Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Lexington Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Transit Casualty Company, Other Affiliate Government Employees Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Pacific Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Transamerica Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Insurance Company of North America, Other Affiliate First State Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Prudential Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate American Excess Insurance Company, Other Affiliate American Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate American Centennial Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Continental, Other Affiliate Crane Co., Other Affiliate Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Other Affiliate INA, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual, Other Affiliate The Home Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Century Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Boston Old Colony Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Northbrook Excess and Surplus Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Underwriters at Lloyds of London and London Market Companies, Other Affiliate Midland Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Motor Vehicle Casualty Insurance, Other Affiliate Mission Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Dairyland Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Centaur Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Integrity Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Globe Indemnity, Other Affiliate Aetna, Other Affiliate New England Reinsurance Corporation, Other Affiliate The Employers Reinsurance Corporation of Kansas City, Kansas, Other Affiliate Granite State Insurance Company, Other Affiliate The North River Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Firemans Fund Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Aetna Casualty and Surety Company, Other Affiliate AIU Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Employers Insurance of Wausau for Crane Co.. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/28/2021)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 7/28/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2021)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Crane Co. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/28/2021)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Crane Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Damages; Demand for Jury Trial byCrane Co.. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/28/2021)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey M. Davis for Defendant Crane Co. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Paige Gardiner (Gardiner, Katherine) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles T. Sheldon (Sheldon, Charles) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Finnell Cronin (Cronin, Justin) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Nicole Empting (Empting, Erin) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by ViacomCBS Inc. identifying Other Affiliate National Amusement, Inc. for ViacomCBS Inc.. (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by General Electric Company.. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ViacomCBS Inc... (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Johnson (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Joinder IN ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1331, 1442(A)(1), AND 1446 by General Electric Company. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Douglas Jamison on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS Inc. f/k/a CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Joinder filed by ViacomCBS Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin D. Jamison In Support of Joinder to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/9/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior. Their case number is CGC-20-276875. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16215751). Filed byRockwell Automation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. ALL DEFENDANTS NEED TO BE ADDED TO THE DOCKET AT CASE OPENING, NOT JUST THE FILING PARTY. This has been corrected by Clerk's Office. No further actio n is necessary. Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Rockwell Automation, Inc. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elorreaga et al v. ABB, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Chemical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Elisabet Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITE Circuit Breaker Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc. doing business as Weir Valves and Controls USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown, Cork & Seal Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericsson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Sandra Lucia Gryder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene, Tweed & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill Brothers Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Delaval Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.T. Thorpe & Sons, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetalClad Insulation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hookers Chemical Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plastics Engineering Company doing business as Plenco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogers Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSCC Wire & Cable, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Jamison
Represented By: Erin Nicole Empting
Represented By: Justin Finnell Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Derek S. Johnson
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Marisa Renee Chaves
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby Valve, LLC, sued as Doe 13
Represented By: Andrew Livingston Sharp
Represented By: Gary David Sharp
Represented By: Jocelyn Mislang Soriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: James P. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: Charles S. Park
Represented By: Edward R. Hugo
Represented By: Paul David Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc., f/k/a Rockwell International, sued as Doe 19
Represented By: Nicole Elisabet Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Elorreaga
Represented By: Cecil B. Crain
Represented By: Marileni Mia Mattis
Represented By: Roger Edward Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Elorreaga
Represented By: Cecil B. Crain
Represented By: Marileni Mia Mattis
Represented By: Roger Edward Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?