Bush v. Walensky et al
Plaintiff: William David Bush
Defendant: Rochelle Walensky and Centers for Disease Control and Prevention
Case Number: 4:2021cv05825
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Filing 9 OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendations byWilliam David Bush. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2021)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/3/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/3/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 2, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re review of Complaint under 28 U.S.C. Section 1915. This case shall be reassigned to a district judge. Objections due within two weeks of the date on which Plaintiff receives a copy of this Report. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on September 2, 2021. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 16, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 8/30/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Service will be determined separately. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 29, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/22/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William David Bush. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2021)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Rochelle Walensky. Filed byWilliam David Bush. Consent/Declination due by 8/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bush v. Walensky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William David Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochelle Walensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Disease Control and Prevention
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?