Hu et al v. Janssen Pharmaceuticals et al
Plaintiff: Sophie Hu and Fumian Zhao
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Bayer, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv05990
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Filing 27 F.R.C.P. 7.1 AND CIVIL L.R. 3-15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bayer Cropscience AG, Corporate Parent Schering Berlin Inc., Corporate Parent Bayer Corporation, Corporate Parent Bayer World Investments B.V., Corporate Parent Bayer Pharma AG, Corporate Parent Bayer US Holding LP, Corporate Parent Bayer Solution B.V., Corporate Parent Bayer HealthCare Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Bayer US II GmbH & Co. KG, Corporate Parent Bayer US AG & Co. KG, Corporate Parent Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH, Corporate Parent Bayer US IP GmbH, Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Mansuryan, Rita) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
October 1, 2021 Filing 26 Defendant Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Notice Of Joinder And Joinder In Defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.s Administrative Motion To Advance January 20, 2022 Hearing On Motion To Stay Action [Ecf No. 20] To October 28, 2021 filed by Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Mansuryan, Rita) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
October 1, 2021 Filing 25 Defendant Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Notice Of Joinder And Joinder In Defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.s Notice Of Motion And Motion To Stay Action Pending Transfer To Mdl 2592 filed by Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Mansuryan, Rita) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
October 1, 2021 Filing 24 Defendant Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.s Answer And Affirmative Defenses To #8 Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial filed by Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Mansuryan, Rita) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
October 1, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Rita Mansuryan On Behalf Of Defendant Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc. (BHCP) (erroneously sued as Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Bayer Corporation)) (Mansuryan, Rita) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
September 30, 2021 Filing 22 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO ADVANCE JANUARY 20, 2022 HEARING ON MOTION TO STAY ACTION [ECF NO. 20] TO OCTOBER 28, 2021 re #20 MOTION to Stay Defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Notice of Motion And Motion To Stay Action Pending Transfer To MDL 2592 filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 10/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rita Mansuryan In Support Of Defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Administrative Motion To Advance January 20, 2022 Hearing On Motion to Stay Action [ECF NO. 20] To October 28, 2021, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Administrative Motion To Advance January 20, 2022 Hearing On Motion to Stay Action [ECF NO. 20] To October 28, 2021)(Mansuryan, Rita) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. of re #20 Defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Notice of Motion And Motion To Stay Action Pending Transfer To MDL 2592 (Mansuryan, Rita) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 20, 2021 Filing 20 Defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Notice of Motion And Motion To Stay Action Pending Transfer To MDL 2592 filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/20/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 10/4/2021. Replies due by 10/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rita Mansuryan In Support Of Defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Motion To Stay Action Pending Transfer To MDL 2592, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Motion To Stay Action Pending Transfer To MDL 2592)(Mansuryan, Rita) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
September 17, 2021 Filing 19 F.R.C.P. 7.1 AND CIVIL L.R. 3-15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Mansuryan, Rita) (Filed on 9/17/2021)
September 17, 2021 Filing 18 Answer to #8 Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Mansuryan, Rita) (Filed on 9/17/2021)
September 13, 2021 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for November 9, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by November 2nd. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-05990-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case,. Signed by The Clerk on 9/13/21. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 10, 2021 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 9, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (Mansuryan, Rita) (Filed on 9/9/2021)
September 9, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Rita Mansuryan (Mansuryan, Rita) (Filed on 9/9/2021)
September 1, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2021)
August 31, 2021 Filing 11 ERRATA re #8 Amended Complaint page 7 signed now by Sophie Hu. (Hu, Sophie) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 31, 2021 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. (Hu, Sophie) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 31, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Sophie Hu as to Bayer. Bayer not served (Hu, Sophie) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 31, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT Names and Typos correction in red text against All Defendants. Filed bySophie Hu. (Hu, Sophie) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 19, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE: #3 Summons: Bayer (Hu, Sophie) (Filed on 8/19/2021) Modified on 8/19/2021 (msrS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/19/2021 (msrS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE: #3 Summons: Janseen (Johnson and Johnson) JJ. (Hu, Sophie) (Filed on 8/19/2021) Modified on 8/19/2021 (msrS, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sophie Hu.. (Hu, Sophie) (Filed on 8/18/2021)
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sophie Hu.. (Hu, Sophie) (Filed on 8/17/2021)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bayer, Janssen Pharmaceuticals. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2021)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/28/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bayer, Janssen Pharmaceuticals (Filing fee $ 402 paid #34611155503). Filed bySophie Hu, Fumian Zhao. Consent/Declination due by 8/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hu et al v. Janssen Pharmaceuticals et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophie Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fumian Zhao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Rita Mansuryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Rita Mansuryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?