McKinley v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Eric McKinley
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer AG, Bayer Pharma AG, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research & Development, LLC and Bayer Corporation
Case Number: 4:2021cv06243
Filed: August 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 10/1/2021. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #17 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANTS JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC, f/k/a JOHNSON & JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC'S, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.'S, JOHNSON & JOHNSON'S, BAYER CORPORATION'S, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.'S, AND BAYER HEALTHCARE LLCS TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
September 22, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC, f/k/a JOHNSON & JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLCS, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.S, JOHNSON & JOHNSONS, BAYER CORPORATIONS, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.S, AND BAYER HEALTHCARE LLCS TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS; DECLARATION OF NOUSHAN NOUREDDINI IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Noureddini, Noushan) (Filed on 9/22/2021)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/13/21. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2021 02:30 PM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2021)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 9/13/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2021)
September 10, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
September 10, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Johnson & Johnson.. (Noureddini, Noushan) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
August 27, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/10/2021. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2021)
August 26, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Eric McKinley.. (Hersh, Nancy) (Filed on 8/26/2021)
August 24, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANTS BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. AND BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC'S TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS filed by Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 20, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANTS JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC, f/k/a JOHNSON & JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLCS, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.S, AND JOHNSON & JOHNSONS TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Noureddini, Noushan) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 18, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Notice of Removal, and have been added to this case: Bayer Corporation. (This is a text-only entry.) (Noureddini, Noushan) (Filed on 8/18/2021)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson, Other Affiliate Janssen Research & Development, LLC, f/k/a Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research & Development, Other Affiliate Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Noureddini, Noushan) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2021 01:30 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
August 16, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, do not bypass the screen and ent er all affiliates or corporate parents. Re: #2 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
August 16, 2021 #Electronic filing error. E-filer is reminded to enter the parties in the order as they were named in the State Court Complaint. Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Jo hnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
August 16, 2021 Address for attorney James Murdica updated on the docket. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
August 13, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT AND OTHER RELATED DOCUMENTS (Noureddini, Noushan) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 13, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Noureddini, Noushan) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 12, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/26/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2021)
August 12, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson (Noureddini, Noushan) (Filed on 8/12/2021)
August 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Alameda. Their case number is RG21102314. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16278828). Filed byJanssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Noureddini, Noushan) (Filed on 8/12/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinley v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric McKinley
Represented By: Nancy Hersh
Represented By: Jody Lloyd Winter
Represented By: Kate Hersh-Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Noushan Noureddini
Represented By: James Murdica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development, LLC
Represented By: Noushan Noureddini
Represented By: James Murdica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Noushan Noureddini
Represented By: James Murdica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer HealthCare LLC
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Pharma AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research & Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?