Lindblad v. Bureau of Land Management
Plaintiff: Robert Lindblad
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Case Number: 4:2021cv06377
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, filed by Robert Lindblad. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 23, 2021 Filing 10 OBJECTION to #8 Report and Recommendations by Robert Lindblad. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2021)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 9/9/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #2 IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION; REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE; ORDER REASSIGNING CASE TO DISTRICT JUDGE. Objections due by 9/21/2021. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/7/2021. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 3, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Robert Lindblad.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2021)
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/17/2021. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE Regarding Resources Available to Pro Se Litigants. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/18/2021. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2021) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert Lindblad. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2021)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for the Conversion of Property against Bureau of Land Management (Filing fee IFPP). Filed by Robert Lindblad. Consent/Declination due by 8/31/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindblad v. Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lindblad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?