Epting v. Dixon
Plaintiff: William Bernard Epting
Defendant: Daniel Joseph Dixon
Case Number: 4:2021cv06932
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC CHC
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
2 Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by William Bernard Epting (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2021)
November 2, 2021 Filing 12 Letter from William Bernard Epting. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2021)
November 2, 2021 In response to plaintiff's letter Dkt. No. 11 mailed Plaintiff status update letter, docket sheet and copies of Dkt. Nos. 5 and 6. (aea, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2021)
October 26, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE re #9 Order Reassigning Case, Case Assigned/Reassigned by William Bernard Epting. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2021)
October 22, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 11/29/2021. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 22, 2021 Mailed notice #10 to plaintiff at Santa Rita Jail.(ljf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2021)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 10/15/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 15, 2021 Filing 8 PLEASE DISREGARD ENTRY**ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 10/15/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 10/15/2021 (haS, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2021 Filing 7 **PLEASE DISREGARD ENTRY**ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 10/15/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 10/15/2021 (haS, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REASSIGN CASE TO DISTRICT JUDGE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/15/2021. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 8, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 10/18/2021. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by William Bernard Epting. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 8, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by William Bernard Epting. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 8, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William Bernard Epting. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daniel Joseph Dixon filed byWilliam Bernard Epting. Consent/Declination due by 10/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Letter To Clerk, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epting v. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bernard Epting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Joseph Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?