Paschoal et al v. Campbell Soup Company et al
Plaintiff: Rafael Paschoal, Lisa Chong and Adina Ringler
Defendant: Campbell Soup Company, Sun-Maid Growers of California and Plum, PBC
Case Number: 4:2021cv07029
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE DOCKET NO. #25 . The written application must be re-filed in its entirety along with a true and correct copy of a certificate of good standing or other similar official document issued by the appropriate authority governing attorney admissions for the relevant bar pursuant to Local Rule 11-3. Counsel must use the 11/2021 revised version of the form. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2021)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ERRATA re #24 Amended Complaint - Exhibits A and B to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Lisa Chong, Rafael Paschoal, Adina Ringler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' First Am. Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Plaintiffs' First Am. Complaint)(Reynolds, Hayley) (Filed on 11/3/2021)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CLERK'S NOTICE RE DOCKET NO. 17 . Notice is hereby given that the case management conference set for December 14, 2021 will be held telephonically. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16569101.) filed by Sun-Maid Growers of California. (Murphy, Christopher) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against All Defendants. Filed byRafael Paschoal, Adina Ringler, Lisa Chong. (Reynolds, Hayley) (Filed on 10/28/2021)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by Campbell Soup Company (Chang, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/26/2021)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Chang (Chang, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/26/2021)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Dale Joseph Giali (Giali, Dale) (Filed on 10/26/2021)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Keri Elizabeth Borders (Borders, Keri) (Filed on 10/26/2021)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #18 Stipulation Extending Time and Setting Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Amended Pleadings due by 10/28/2021; Motions due by 11/18/2021; Responses due by 12/16/2021; and Replies due by 1/6/2022. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2021)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (JOINT) - Extending Time and Setting Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Campbell Soup Company. (Borders, Keri) (Filed on 10/14/2021)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for December 14, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by December 7th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-07029-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2021)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 10/5/21. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2021)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Address for attorney Jodi Lynn Benassi updated on the docket. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sun-Maid Growers of California.. (Benassi, Jodi) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sun-Maid Growers of California identifying Other Affiliate Hamilton Managing General Agency Americas LLC for Sun-Maid Growers of California. (Benassi, Jodi) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sun-Maid Growers of California (Benassi, Jodi) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jodi Lynn Benassi (Benassi, Jodi) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Campbell Soup Company. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2021)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Rafael Paschoal, Adina Ringler, Lisa Chong as to Campbell Soup Company. (Safier, Seth) (Filed on 9/23/2021)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #8 Proposed Summons filed by Adina Ringler, Lisa Chong, Rafael Paschoal. The summons issued on 9/10/21 (ECF No. 6) needs to be returned before it can be re-issued. E-filer can use the event "SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED" OR "SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED" to return the summons. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2021)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Safier, Seth) (Filed on 9/22/2021)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lisa Chong, Rafael Paschoal, Adina Ringler.. (Safier, Seth) (Filed on 9/13/2021)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Campbell Soup Company, Sun-Maid Growers of California. (Attachments: #1 Sun-Maid Growers of CA)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2021 02:00 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/24/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Safier, Seth) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Safier, Seth) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16376081.). Filed byRafael Paschoal, Adina Ringler, Lisa Chong. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Safier, Seth) (Filed on 9/10/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paschoal et al v. Campbell Soup Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Paschoal
Represented By: Seth Adam Safier
Represented By: Hayley A Reynolds
Represented By: Marie Ann McCrary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Chong
Represented By: Seth Adam Safier
Represented By: Hayley A Reynolds
Represented By: Marie Ann McCrary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adina Ringler
Represented By: Seth Adam Safier
Represented By: Hayley A Reynolds
Represented By: Marie Ann McCrary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell Soup Company
Represented By: Jennifer M. Chang
Represented By: Dale Joseph Giali
Represented By: Keri Elizabeth Borders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun-Maid Growers of California
Represented By: Jodi Lynn Benassi
Represented By: Christopher MacNeil Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plum, PBC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?