Green Renewable Organic and Water Holdings, LLC v. Bloomfield Investments, LLC
Plaintiff: Green Renewable Organic and Water Holdings, LLC, Green Renewable Organic and Water Holdings, LLC doing business as Grow Holdings and W. Quay Hays
Defendant: Bloomfield Investments, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv07181
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Bloomfield Investments, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 11/26/2021. Replies due by 12/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George Morris, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Correll, Charles) (Filed on 11/12/2021)
November 12, 2021 Filing 32 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byBloomfield Investments, LLC. (Correll, Charles) (Filed on 11/12/2021)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Mandell, Lauren. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2021)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Hanin, Mark. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2021)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #28 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Mark Aaron Serlin terminated. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2021)
October 26, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by Green Renewable Organic and Water Holdings, LLC, W. Quay Hays. (Flanagan, Mark) (Filed on 10/26/2021)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. TERMINATING AS MOOT Dkt. No. #11 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Grow Holding's and Quay Hays' Complaint in light of Dkt. No. #22 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2021)
October 22, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Motion to Substitute Attorney. The correct event can be found at Civil Events > Motions and Relate d Filings > Motions - General > Substitute Attorney. Please review Local Rule 11-5 regarding requirements for substitution of attorney and re-file in its entirety. Re: #24 Affidavit filed by W. Quay Hays, Green Renewable Organic and Water Holdings, LLC (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2021)
October 22, 2021 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bloomfield Investments, LLC. Filed byGreen Renewable Organic and Water Holdings, LLC, W. Quay Hays. (Flanagan, Mark) (Filed on 10/22/2021)
October 22, 2021 Filing 25 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Amended Complaint filed by Green Renewable Organic and Water Holdings, LLC, W. Quay Hays. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Amended Complaint, #4 Sealed Version of Amended Complaint)(Flanagan, Mark) (Filed on 10/22/2021)
October 22, 2021 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT Request to be Removed From Notices of Electronic Filing by Green Renewable Organic and Water Holdings, LLC, W. Quay Hays. (Serlin, Mark) (Filed on 10/22/2021)
October 22, 2021 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by Green Renewable Organic and Water Holdings, LLC, W. Quay Hays identifying Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent and No Publicly Held Corporation Owns 10% or More of Its Stock, Other Affiliate The Hays Family Trust, Other Affiliate Sharon Hays for Green Renewable Organic and Water Holdings, LLC; Other Affiliate The Hays Family Trust, Other Affiliate Sharon Hays for W. Quay Hays. (Flanagan, Mark) (Filed on 10/22/2021)
October 21, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Re: #21 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by W. Quay Hays, Green Renewable Organic and Water Holdings, LLC (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2021)
October 21, 2021 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bloomfield Investments, LLC. Filed byGreen Renewable Organic and Water Holdings, LLC, W. Quay Hays. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D)(Flanagan, Mark) (Filed on 10/21/2021) **Locked per filer's request** Modified on 10/22/2021 (ddkS, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2021 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by Green Renewable Organic and Water Holdings, LLC, W. Quay Hays (and Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Flanagan, Mark) (Filed on 10/21/2021)
October 21, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Bowker (Bowker, David) (Filed on 10/21/2021)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #18 Stipulation To Extend Time For Plaintiff to Amend Complaint and for Defendant to Respond to Amended Complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2021)
October 21, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Time For Plaintiff to Amend Complaint and for Defendant to Respond to Amended Complaint filed by Green Renewable Organic and Water Holdings, LLC, W. Quay Hays and Bloomfield Investments, LLC. (Flanagan, Mark) (Filed on 10/21/2021) Modified on 10/22/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16522332.) filed by Green Renewable Organic and Water Holdings, LLC, W. Quay Hays. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Mandell, Lauren) (Filed on 10/21/2021)
October 21, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16522270.) filed by Green Renewable Organic and Water Holdings, LLC, W. Quay Hays. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hanin, Mark) (Filed on 10/21/2021)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #14 Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule for Defendant's #11 Motion to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2021)
October 7, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Grow Holding's and Quay Hays' Complaint, See Docket No. #15 :Responses due by 10/21/2021 and Replies due by 11/4/2021. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2021)
October 6, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Grow Holding's and Quay Hays' Complaint filed by Green Renewable Organic and Water Holdings, LLC, W. Quay Hays and Bloomfield Investments, LLC. (Flanagan, Mark) (Filed on 10/6/2021) Modified on 10/7/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Flanagan (Flanagan, Mark) (Filed on 10/6/2021)
September 24, 2021 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Charles Christian Correll, Jr.. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #: 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Bloomfield Investments, LLC). Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2021)
September 23, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by George Ruben Morris (Morris, George) (Filed on 9/23/2021)
September 23, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Grow Holding's and Quay Hays' Complaint filed by Bloomfield Investments, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 10/7/2021. Replies due by 10/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Correll, Charles) (Filed on 9/23/2021)
September 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Christian Correll, Jr (Correll, Charles) (Filed on 9/23/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for January 4, 2022, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by December 28th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-07181-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case,. Signed by The Clerk on 9/21/21. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
September 20, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bloomfield Investments, LLC.. (Correll, Charles) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
September 17, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bloomfield Investments, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bloomfield Investments, LLC, Other Affiliate Burford Capital Ltd. for Bloomfield Investments, LLC. and Certification of Interested Entities of Burford Capital Ltd. and HLDR Investments II S.a.r.l. (Correll, Charles) (Filed on 9/17/2021)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2021)
September 17, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Re: #2 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Bloomfield Investments, LLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2021)
September 16, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/1/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2021) Modified on 9/17/2021 (anjS, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bloomfield Investments, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, [Corporate Disclosure Statement (FED R. CIV. P. 7.1)] (Correll, Charles) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the County of Napa. Their case number is 20CV000765. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16398943). Filed byBloomfield Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Correll, Charles) (Filed on 9/16/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Renewable Organic and Water Holdings, LLC v. Bloomfield Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Renewable Organic and Water Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Renewable Organic and Water Holdings, LLC doing business as Grow Holdings
Represented By: David W. Bowker
Represented By: Lauren A. Mandell
Represented By: Mark D. Flanagan
Represented By: Mark L. Hanin
Represented By: Mark Aaron Serlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. Quay Hays
Represented By: David W. Bowker
Represented By: Lauren A. Mandell
Represented By: Mark D. Flanagan
Represented By: Mark L. Hanin
Represented By: Mark Aaron Serlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloomfield Investments, LLC
Represented By: Charles Christian Correll, Jr.
Represented By: George Ruben Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?