Sanders v. Department of Fair Employment and Housing
Plaintiff: Malaka Sanders
Defendant: Department of Fair Employment and Housing
Case Number: 4:2021cv07740
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Department of Fair Employment and Housing. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2021)
November 29, 2021 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE terminating motion as moot re #16 Fourth MOTION for Entry of Default (Addendum). The #14 Fourth Motion for Entry of Default was declined. See docket 15. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 24, 2021 Filing 17 Proposed Summons. (Sanders, Malaka) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 24, 2021 Filing 16 Fourth MOTION for Entry of Default (Addendum) filed by Malaka Sanders. (Sanders, Malaka) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 24, 2021 Filing 15 Clerk's DECLINATION OF DEFAULT. Service does not meet the requirements of California Code of Civil Procedure 416.50(a). See dockets 9, #11 , and #13 .A request for a new summons should be docketed using the event "Proposed Summons." (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Related documents(s) #14 )(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 24, 2021 Filing 14 Fourth MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Malaka Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sanders, Malaka) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE: THIRD MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; denying #12 Third Motion for Entry of Default. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2021)
November 19, 2021 Filing 12 Third MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Malaka Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Sanders, Malaka) (Filed on 11/19/2021)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE: SECOND MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT re #10 Second MOTION for Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/19/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 17, 2021 Filing 10 Second MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Malaka Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Sanders, Malaka) (Filed on 11/17/2021)
November 16, 2021 Filing 9 Clerk's DECLINATION OF DEFAULT. Service does not meet the requirements of California Code of Civil Procedure 416.50(a), "summons may be served on a public entity by delivering a copy of the summons and of the complaint to the clerk, secretary, president, presiding officer, or other head of its governing body.". (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Related documents(s) #8 )(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 12, 2021 Filing 8 First MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Malaka Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sanders, Malaka) (Filed on 11/12/2021)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #3 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 6, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Upon Robert Bonta, California State Attorney General on behalf of Defendant Department of Fair Employment and Housing served on 10/4/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2021)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Department of Fair Employment and Housing. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Malaka Sanders.. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Malaka Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 12/27/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/3/2022 02:00 PM. (Attachments: #1 YGR - Standing Order, #2 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #3 Standing Orders for All Judges)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Department of Fair Employment and Housing, (Filing Fee: $402.00. Receipt no. 44611017264). Filed by Malaka Sanders. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Department of Fair Employment and Housing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malaka Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Fair Employment and Housing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?