Nettles v. Paramedics Logistics Operating Co., LLC et al
Plaintiff: Simone Nettles
Defendant: Paramedics Logistics Operating Co., LLC, Paramedics Logistics California, LLC dba Paramedics Plus and Paramedics Logistics California, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv08401
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE re #21 Request for Judicial Notice by Simone Nettles. (Kramer, Daniel) (Filed on 12/20/2021)
December 20, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY (re #19 MOTION to Remand ) filed bySimone Nettles. (Kramer, Daniel) (Filed on 12/20/2021)
December 13, 2021 Filing 21 Request for Judicial Notice re #20 Opposition/Response to Motion to Remand filed byParamedics Logistics California, LLC, Paramedics Logistics Operating Co., LLC. (Related document(s) #20 ) (Wojcik, Timothy) (Filed on 12/13/2021)
December 13, 2021 Filing 20 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #19 MOTION to Remand ) filed byParamedics Logistics California, LLC, Paramedics Logistics Operating Co., LLC. (Wojcik, Timothy) (Filed on 12/13/2021)
November 29, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand filed by Simone Nettles. Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 12/13/2021. Replies due by 12/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447)(Kramer, Daniel) (Filed on 11/29/2021)
November 23, 2021 Filing 18 Reply In Support of #9 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Paramedics Logistics California, LLC, Paramedics Logistics Operating Co., LLC. (Wojcik, Timothy) (Filed on 11/23/2021) Modified on 11/24/2021 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2021 Filing 17 Reply In Support of #8 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Paramedics Logistics California, LLC, Paramedics Logistics Operating Co., LLC. (Wojcik, Timothy) (Filed on 11/23/2021) Modified on 11/24/2021 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2021 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS #8 TO BE HELD VIA ZOOM PLATFORM. Set/Reset Deadlines as to: #8 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, 1/25/2022 02:00 PM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference Only before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Zoom link information will be posted on the docket in advance of the hearing. Zoom link information is also on the Judge's page on the court website www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/gonzalez-rogers-yvonne-ygr/ (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2021)
November 18, 2021 Filing 15 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #8 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed bySimone Nettles. (Attachments: #1 Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice)(Kramer, Daniel) (Filed on 11/18/2021)
November 18, 2021 Filing 14 Renotice motion hearing re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed byParamedics Logistics California, LLC, Paramedics Logistics Operating Co., LLC. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Wojcik, Timothy) (Filed on 11/18/2021)
November 17, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Kramer (Kramer, Daniel) (Filed on 11/17/2021)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 11/16/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2021)
November 15, 2021 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2021)
November 4, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Paramedics Logistics California, LLC, Paramedics Logistics Operating Co., LLC.. (Wojcik, Timothy) (Filed on 11/4/2021)
November 4, 2021 Filing 9 Request for Judicial Notice re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed byParamedics Logistics California, LLC, Paramedics Logistics Operating Co., LLC. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Wojcik, Timothy) (Filed on 11/4/2021)
November 4, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Paramedics Logistics California, LLC, Paramedics Logistics Operating Co., LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Responses due by 11/18/2021. Replies due by 11/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Wojcik, Timothy) (Filed on 11/4/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paramedics Logistics California, LLC, Paramedics Logistics Operating Co., LLC identifying Corporate Parent Paramedics Logistics Holding Company, LLC for Paramedics Logistics California, LLC, Paramedics Logistics Operating Co., LLC. (Wojcik, Timothy) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 1/20/202 2. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 11/12/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/12/2021. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Re: #2 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Paramedics Logistics Operating Co., LLC, Paramedics Logistics California, LLC. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Paramedics Logistics California, LLC dba Paramedics Plus, Paramedics Logistics Operating Co., LLC (Wojcik, Timothy) (Filed on 10/28/2021)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paramedics Logistics California, LLC dba Paramedics Plus, Paramedics Logistics Operating Co., LLC (Wojcik, Timothy) (Filed on 10/28/2021)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California. Their case number is RG21108566. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-16566654). Filed byParamedics Logistics California, LLC dba Paramedics Plus, Paramedics Logistics Operating Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wojcik, Timothy) (Filed on 10/28/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nettles v. Paramedics Logistics Operating Co., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simone Nettles
Represented By: Edwin Aiwazian
Represented By: Daniel Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramedics Logistics Operating Co., LLC
Represented By: Timothy Michael Wojcik
Represented By: Tracy R Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramedics Logistics California, LLC dba Paramedics Plus
Represented By: Timothy Michael Wojcik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramedics Logistics California, LLC
Represented By: Tracy R Williams
Represented By: Timothy Michael Wojcik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?