Gabriella v. Recology Inc.
Plaintiff: Tabak Gabriella
Defendant: Recology Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv08460
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2021 Filing 12 Statement of Non-Opposition TO PLANTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byRecology Inc.. (Geiger, Robert) (Filed on 12/23/2021)
December 13, 2021 Filing 11 Request for Judicial Notice filed byTabak Gabriella. (Siegal, Joel) (Filed on 12/13/2021)
December 13, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Tabak Gabriella. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joel H. Siegal in Support of Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Amended Complaint, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Siegal, Joel) (Filed on 12/13/2021)
December 13, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #10 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint : Responses due by 12/27/2021; Replies due by 1/3/2022; and Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2021)
November 16, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for February 1, 2022, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by January 25, 2022. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-08460-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2021)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 11/16/2021. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2021)
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2021)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Recology Inc... (Geiger, Robert) (Filed on 11/12/2021)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Recology Inc. re #3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, 2 Case Assigned by Intake, Judge's Standing Orders (Geiger, Robert) (Filed on 11/4/2021)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Recology Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Geiger, Robert) (Filed on 11/1/2021)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/25/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2022 at 1:30 PM in Oakland - To be determined. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2021)
October 29, 2021 Answer to Removal Complaint (DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT) by Recology Inc. - [Pls. Refer to Document [1-1], Filed 10/29/21, Page 70 of 84]. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/12/2021. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Civil Action from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-21-594674. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-16572128). Filed byRecology Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-F, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Defendant's Certificate of Interested Parties, #4 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Geiger, Robert) (Filed on 10/29/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gabriella v. Recology Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabak Gabriella
Represented By: Joel H. Siegal
Represented By: Richard Lewis Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recology Inc.
Represented By: Robert Maxwell Geiger
Represented By: Lindbergh Porter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?