Douvia v. ON24, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James Douvia
Defendant: ON24, Inc., Sharat Sharan, Steven Vattuone, Irwin Federman, Denise Persson, Holger Staude, Dominique Trempont, Barry Zwarenstein, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated, Canaccord Genuity LLC, Needham & Company, LLC, Piper Sandler & Co. and William Blair & Company, L.L.C.
Case Number: 4:2021cv08578
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER AS MODIFIED by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #15 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE DEADLINE PENDING APPOINTMENT OF LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL AND VACATING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Status Report due by 1/7/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2021)
November 23, 2021 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Canaccord Genuity LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Needham & Company, LLC, Piper Sandler & Co., Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated, William Blair & Company, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. for Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC ; Corporate Parent Baird Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Baird Financial Group, Inc. for Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated; Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co., Corporate Parent J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings Inc. for J.P. Morgan Securities LLC; Corporate Parent Needham Group, Inc. for Needham & Company, LLC; Corporate Parent WBC Holdings, LP for William Blair & Company, L.L.C.; Corporate Parent Piper Sandler Companies for Piper Sandler & Co.; Corporate Parent KeyCorp for KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc.; Corporate Parent Canaccord Genuity Group Inc., Corporate Parent Canaccord Adams Delaware Inc., Corporate Parent Collins Stewart Inc., Corporate Parent Canaccord Adams Financial Group Inc. for Canaccord Genuity LLC. (Shimada, Charlene) (Filed on 11/23/2021)
November 23, 2021 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by James Douvia. Service waived by Barry Zwarenstein waiver sent on 11/8/2021, answer due 1/7/2022. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 11/23/2021)
November 23, 2021 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by James Douvia. Service waived by Steven Vattuone waiver sent on 11/8/2021, answer due 1/7/2022. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 11/23/2021)
November 23, 2021 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by James Douvia. Service waived by Dominique Trempont waiver sent on 11/8/2021, answer due 1/7/2022. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 11/23/2021)
November 23, 2021 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by James Douvia. Service waived by Holger Staude waiver sent on 11/8/2021, answer due 1/7/2022. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 11/23/2021)
November 23, 2021 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by James Douvia. Service waived by Sharat Sharan waiver sent on 11/8/2021, answer due 1/7/2022. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 11/23/2021)
November 23, 2021 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by James Douvia. Service waived by Denise Persson waiver sent on 11/8/2021, answer due 1/7/2022. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 11/23/2021)
November 23, 2021 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by James Douvia. Service waived by ON24, Inc. waiver sent on 11/8/2021, answer due 1/7/2022. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 11/23/2021)
November 23, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by James Douvia. Service waived by Irwin Federman waiver sent on 11/8/2021, answer due 1/7/2022. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 11/23/2021)
November 22, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Henderson O'Leary (O'Leary, Robert) (Filed on 11/22/2021)
November 22, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M Papay (Papay, Kevin) (Filed on 11/22/2021)
November 22, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Charlene Sachi Shimada (Shimada, Charlene) (Filed on 11/22/2021)
November 22, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Defendants Response Deadline Pending Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Vacating Initial Case Management Conference filed by Irwin Federman, ON24, Inc., Denise Persson, Sharat Sharan, Holger Staude, Dominique Trempont, Steven Vattuone, Barry Zwarenstein. (White, Anna) (Filed on 11/22/2021)
November 17, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Douvia. William Blair & Company, L.L.C. served on 11/8/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 11/17/2021)
November 17, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Douvia. Piper Sandler & Co. served on 11/8/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 11/17/2021)
November 17, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Douvia. Needham & Company, LLC served on 11/9/2021, answer due 11/30/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 11/17/2021)
November 17, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Douvia. Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated served on 11/8/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 11/17/2021)
November 17, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Douvia. KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc. served on 11/8/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 11/17/2021)
November 17, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Douvia. J.P. Morgan Securities LLC served on 11/8/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 11/17/2021)
November 17, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Douvia. Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC served on 11/8/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 11/17/2021)
November 17, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Douvia. Canaccord Genuity LLC served on 11/8/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 11/17/2021)
November 4, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2021)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 1/31/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2021)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2021)
November 3, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16590133.) filed by James Douvia. (Laughlin, Thomas) (Filed on 11/3/2021)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 11/3/2021)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Canaccord Genuity LLC, Irwin Federman, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Needham & Company, LLC, ON24, Inc., Denise Persson, Piper Sandler & Co., Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated, Sharat Sharan, Holger Staude, Dominique Trempont, Steven Vattuone, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Barry Zwarenstein ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16590092.). Filed byJames Douvia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 11/3/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douvia v. ON24, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Douvia
Represented By: Thomas L Laughlin, IV
Represented By: John T. Jasnoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ON24, Inc.
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharat Sharan
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Vattuone
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irwin Federman
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Persson
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holger Staude
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominique Trempont
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Zwarenstein
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Represented By: Robert Henderson O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Represented By: Robert Henderson O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc.
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Represented By: Robert Henderson O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Represented By: Robert Henderson O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canaccord Genuity LLC
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Represented By: Robert Henderson O'Leary
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Needham & Company, LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Represented By: Robert Henderson O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piper Sandler & Co.
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Represented By: Robert Henderson O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Blair & Company, L.L.C.
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Represented By: Robert Henderson O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?