Alfia v. Coinbase Global, Inc.
Plaintiff: Adam Alfia
Defendant: Coinbase Global, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv08689
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Alex G Tse
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2023 Filing 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/8/2023.Total Time in Court: 3 Minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Evan Selik. Defendant Attorney: Bree Hann. The Court orders that case shall remain STAYED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/8/2023)
July 26, 2023 Filing 41 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for August 8, 2023, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. The August 8, 2023 proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys and pro se litigants appearing for a telephonic case management conference are required to dial-in at least 15 minutes before the hearing to check-in with the CRD. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2023)
July 25, 2023 Filing 40 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Coinbase Global, Inc.. (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 7/25/2023)
March 28, 2023 Filing 39 STATUS REPORT by Coinbase Global, Inc.. (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 3/28/2023)
November 28, 2022 Filing 38 STATUS REPORT by Coinbase Global, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bree Hann)(Hann, Bree) (Filed on 11/28/2022)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DIRECTING the parties to file a joint status report of no more than two pages in accordance with Dkt. No. #31 by November 28, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 22, 2022 Reset Deadline, See Docket No. 37 : Status Report due by 11/28/2022. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
August 25, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Bree Hann and Proposed Order (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 8/25/2022)
August 10, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Gilbert Gordon Walton (Walton, Gilbert) (Filed on 8/10/2022)
August 10, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Esther Kim Chang (Chang, Esther) (Filed on 8/10/2022)
August 10, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by William Fred Norton, Jr (Norton, William) (Filed on 8/10/2022)
August 10, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Bree Hann (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 8/10/2022)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING #18 MOTION TOCOMPEL ARBITRATION. Status Report due by 11/19/2022. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2022)
April 27, 2022 Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUSNEL RE DOCKET NO. #29 . This Court does not accept letter filings. In the future, counsel should not file a letter to provide this Court with information. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2022)
April 27, 2022 Filing 29 Letter from Steven P. Ragland to Judge Gilliam re Bielski Decision. (Ragland, Steven) (Filed on 4/27/2022)
April 22, 2022 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Court takes the pending #18 motion to compel arbitration and to stay filings under submission. The hearing previously scheduled for April 28, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. is vacated. The Court will issue a written order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2022)
March 24, 2022 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE RE DOCKET NO. #18 . Notice is hereby given that the hearing on the motion set for April 28, 2022 will be held in-person before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2022)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying #25 Motion for Leave to File A SUR-REPLY TO DEFENDANTS REPLY REGARDING ITS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY THE CASE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2022)
March 22, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File A SUR-REPLY TO DEFENDANTS REPLY REGARDING ITS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY THE CASE filed by Adam Alfia. (Selik, Evan) (Filed on 3/22/2022)
February 11, 2022 Filing 24 Request for Judicial Notice re #23 Reply to Opposition/Response re Defendant Coinbase Global, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay filed byCoinbase Global, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #23 ) (Meyer, Erin) (Filed on 2/11/2022)
February 11, 2022 Filing 23 REPLY (re #18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay ) filed byCoinbase Global, Inc.. (Meyer, Erin) (Filed on 2/11/2022)
January 31, 2022 Filing 22 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay ) filed byAdam Alfia. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Selik, Evan) (Filed on 1/31/2022)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #20 Stipulation Re: Case Management Conference. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2022)
January 24, 2022 Filing 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Case Management Conference filed by Coinbase Global, Inc.. (Ragland, Steven) (Filed on 1/24/2022) Modified on 1/25/2022 (slh, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2022 Filing 19 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Meyer, Erin) (Filed on 1/21/2022)
January 21, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Coinbase Global, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 2/4/2022. Replies due by 2/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Carter McPherson-Evans in Support of Defendant Coinbase Global, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Individual Arbitration and to Stay, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4, #6 Exhibit Ex. 5, #7 Exhibit Ex. 6, #8 Exhibit Ex. 7, #9 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Coinbase Global, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay)(Meyer, Erin) (Filed on 1/21/2022) Modified on 1/24/2022 (slh, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2022 Filing 17 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Selik, Evan) (Filed on 1/21/2022)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DIRECTING the Clerk's Office to remove Dkt. No. #15 Conditional Order of Dismissal from the docket, as it was mistakenly e-filed in the wrong case. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2022)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ***DISREGARD, E-filed in the Wrong Case.*** CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL Re Docket No. [ #29 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/10/2022. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2022) Modified on 1/10/2022 (ndr, COURT STAFF). (Main Document 15 replaced on 1/11/2022) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2022 ***Clear "Closed" Flag, Docket No. #15 E-filed in the Wrong Case.*** (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2022)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #12 Stipulation. Motions due by 1/21/2022. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2021)
December 2, 2021 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Coinbase Global, Inc. (Meyer, Erin) (Filed on 12/2/2021)
December 2, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Coinbase Global, Inc.. (Meyer, Erin) (Filed on 12/2/2021)
December 2, 2021 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for February 15, 2022, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by February 8, 2022. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-08689-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2021)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 12/02/2021. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2021)
December 1, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2021)
December 1, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Adam Alfia.. (Selik, Evan) (Filed on 12/1/2021)
November 9, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Coinbase Global, Inc.. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2021)
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2021)
November 8, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/22/2021. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2021)
November 8, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Adam Alfia identifying Other Affiliate Coinbase Global, Inc. for Adam Alfia. (Selik, Evan) (Filed on 11/8/2021)
November 8, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Adam Alfia . (Selik, Evan) (Filed on 11/8/2021)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Selik, Evan) (Filed on 11/8/2021)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Coinbase Global, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16604859.). Filed byAdam Alfia. (Selik, Evan) (Filed on 11/8/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alfia v. Coinbase Global, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Alfia
Represented By: Evan Matthew Selik
Represented By: Christine Zaouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coinbase Global, Inc.
Represented By: Erin E. Meyer
Represented By: Steven Paul Ragland
Represented By: Bree Hann
Represented By: Esther Kim Chang
Represented By: Gilbert Gordon Walton
Represented By: William Fred Norton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?