Goemer et al v. ON24, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anna L. Goemer and Gregory C. Goemer
Defendant: ON24, Inc., Sharat Sharan, Steven Vattuone, Irwin Federman, Denise Persson, Holger Staude, Dominique Trempont and Barry Zwarenstein
Case Number: 4:2021cv08744
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 17 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases Re 21-cv-8578-YGR. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/7/2022. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2022)
January 6, 2022 Filing 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Defendants' Response Deadline Pending Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Vacating Initial Case Management Conference filed by Irwin Federman, ON24, Inc., Denise Persson, Sharat Sharan, Holger Staude, Dominique Trempont, Steven Vattuone, Barry Zwarenstein. (White, Anna) (Filed on 1/6/2022)
December 20, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gregory C. Goemer, Anna L. Goemer. Service waived by Dominique Trempont waiver sent on 11/11/2021, answer due 1/10/2022. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/20/2021)
December 20, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gregory C. Goemer, Anna L. Goemer. Service waived by Barry Zwarenstein waiver sent on 11/11/2021, answer due 1/10/2022. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/20/2021)
December 20, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gregory C. Goemer, Anna L. Goemer. Service waived by Denise Persson waiver sent on 11/11/2021, answer due 1/10/2022. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/20/2021)
December 20, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gregory C. Goemer, Anna L. Goemer. Service waived by Holger Staude waiver sent on 11/11/2021, answer due 1/10/2022. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/20/2021)
December 20, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gregory C. Goemer, Anna L. Goemer. Service waived by Irwin Federman waiver sent on 11/11/2021, answer due 1/10/2022. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/20/2021)
December 20, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gregory C. Goemer, Anna L. Goemer. Service waived by Steven Vattuone waiver sent on 11/11/2021, answer due 1/10/2022. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/20/2021)
December 20, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gregory C. Goemer, Anna L. Goemer. Service waived by Sharat Sharan waiver sent on 11/11/2021, answer due 1/10/2022. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/20/2021)
December 20, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gregory C. Goemer, Anna L. Goemer. Service waived by ON24, Inc. waiver sent on 11/11/2021, answer due 1/10/2022. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/20/2021)
November 16, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for February 8, 2022 before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by February 1st. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-08744-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2021)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2021)
November 10, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Irwin Federman, ON24, Inc., Denise Persson, Sharat Sharan, Holger Staude, Dominique Trempont, Steven Vattuone, Barry Zwarenstein. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2021)
November 10, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/1/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2021)
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/24/2021. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2021)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/10/2021)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Irwin Federman, ON24, Inc., Denise Persson, Sharat Sharan, Holger Staude, Dominique Trempont, Steven Vattuone, Barry Zwarenstein ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16615870.). Filed byGregory C. Goemer, Anna L. Goemer. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Schedule A, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/10/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goemer et al v. ON24, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna L. Goemer
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory C. Goemer
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ON24, Inc.
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharat Sharan
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Vattuone
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irwin Federman
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Persson
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holger Staude
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominique Trempont
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Zwarenstein
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?