Taylor et al v. Columbia Property Trust, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Taylor, WeissLaw LLP and Long Law LLP
Defendant: Columbia Property Trust, Inc., Carmen M. Bowser, John L. Dixon, David B. Henry, Murray J. McCabe, E. Nelson Mills, Constance B. Moore, Michael S. Robb, Thomas G. Wattles and Francis X. Wentworth, Jr.
Case Number: 4:2021cv08789
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2021 Filing 9 THIRD CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/12/2022. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2021)
December 14, 2021 Filing 8 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/28/2021. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2021)
November 29, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 12/13/2021. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2021)
November 15, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Carmen M. Bowser, Columbia Property Trust, Inc., John L. Dixon, David B. Henry, Murray J. McCabe, E. Nelson Mills, Constance B. Moore, Michael S. Robb, Thomas G. Wattles, Francis X. Wentworth, Jr. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2021)
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/8/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/15/2022 01:30 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 15, 2021 #Electronic filing error. WeissLaw LLP and Long Law LLP are removed from the docket as they are not named in the Complaint. E-filer is reminded to enter parties only as named i n the Complaint. The County Code in the case opening screen has also been corrected to "Los Angeles County" as marked in the Civil Cover Sheet and NOT San Francisco as it refers to plaintiff's county of residence. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Christopher Taylor. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2021)
November 15, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Parties named in the Complaint are plaintiff and defendants. They are not Corporate Parents or Other Affiliates. Corrected by Clerk's Office . No further action is necessary. Re: #3 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Christopher Taylor. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2021)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/26/2021. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2021)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Christopher Taylor identifying Corporate Parent Columbia Property Trust, Inc., Other Affiliate Carmen M. Bowser, Other Affiliate John L. Dixon, Other Affiliate David B. Henry, Other Affiliate Murray J. McCabe, Other Affiliate E. Nelson Mills, Other Affiliate Constance B. Moore, Other Affiliate Michael S. Robb, Other Affiliate Thomas G. Wattles, Other Affiliate Francis X. Wentworth, Jr. for Christopher Taylor. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 11/12/2021)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 List of Defendants)(Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 11/12/2021)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carmen M. Bowser, Columbia Property Trust, Inc., John L. Dixon, David B. Henry, Murray J. McCabe, E. Nelson Mills, Constance B. Moore, Michael S. Robb, Thomas G. Wattles, Francis X. Wentworth, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16620888.). Filed byChristopher Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 11/12/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor et al v. Columbia Property Trust, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Taylor
Represented By: Joel E. Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WeissLaw LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Long Law LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Property Trust, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen M. Bowser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murray J. McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Nelson Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constance B. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S. Robb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas G. Wattles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis X. Wentworth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?