Prather v. Zimmer Biomet Spine, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jane Prather
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Spine, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv08814
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING. Notice is hereby given that the hearing on the #5 MOTION to Dismiss previously scheduled for 1/11/2022 is continued to 2/1/2022 at 2:00 p.m. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Reset Hearing as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure, Rule 12(B)(6); and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof,. Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are rem inded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2022)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2021)
December 16, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16728664.) filed by Zimmer Biomet Spine, Inc.. (Gulbrandsen, Lars) (Filed on 12/16/2021)
December 9, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY (re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure, Rule 12(B)(6); and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) ISO Defendant Zimmer Biomet Spine's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to FRCP, Rule 12(B)(6) filed byZimmer Biomet Spine, Inc.. (Zadoorian, Ankineh) (Filed on 12/9/2021)
December 2, 2021 Filing 15 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure, Rule 12(B)(6); and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion To Dismiss filed byJane Prather. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sedghani, Sami) (Filed on 12/2/2021)
December 2, 2021 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jane Prather (Sedghani, Sami) (Filed on 12/2/2021)
December 2, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Sami Sedghani on behalf of Plaintiff (Sedghani, Sami) (Filed on 12/2/2021)
December 1, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure, Rule 12(B)(6): Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, 1/11/2022 02:00 PM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference Only before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Zoom link information will be posted on the docket in advance of the hearing. Zoom link information is also on the Judge's page on the court website www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/gonzalez-rogers-yvonne-ygr/(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2021)
December 1, 2021 Filing 12 Renotice motion hearing re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure, Rule 12(B)(6); and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byZimmer Biomet Spine, Inc.. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Zadoorian, Ankineh) (Filed on 12/1/2021)
November 22, 2021 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BEFORE HON. YVONNE GONZALEZ ROGERS. Case Management Statement due by 2/21/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 2/28/2022 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers via Zoom Webinar Videoconference Only. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) Zoom link information will be posted on the docket in advance of the hearing. Zoom link information is also on the Judge's page on the court website www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/gonzalez-rogers-yvonne-ygr/(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2021)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 11/22/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2021)
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2021)
November 18, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Zimmer Biomet Spine, Inc... (Zadoorian, Ankineh) (Filed on 11/18/2021)
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 Request for Judicial Notice re #6 Declaration in Support, #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure, Rule 12(B)(6); and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byZimmer Biomet Spine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #6 , #5 ) (Zadoorian, Ankineh) (Filed on 11/18/2021)
November 18, 2021 Filing 6 Declaration of Ankineh Zadoorian in Support of #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure, Rule 12(B)(6); and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byZimmer Biomet Spine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Declaration, #3 Exhibit C to Declaration, #4 Exhibit D to Declaration)(Related document(s) #5 ) (Zadoorian, Ankineh) (Filed on 11/18/2021)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure, Rule 12(B)(6); and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Zimmer Biomet Spine, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 12/2/2021. Replies due by 12/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Zadoorian, Ankineh) (Filed on 11/18/2021)
November 16, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zimmer Biomet Spine, Inc. (Zadoorian, Ankineh) (Filed on 11/16/2021)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2021)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/26/2021. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2021)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County. Their case number is CGC-21-595350. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-16622763). Filed byZimmer Biomet Spine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Zadoorian, Ankineh) (Filed on 11/12/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prather v. Zimmer Biomet Spine, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Prather
Represented By: Daniel Azizi
Represented By: Sami Sedghani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Spine, Inc.
Represented By: Ankineh Zadoorian
Represented By: Lars E. Gulbrandsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?