Robinson et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Plaintiff: Barbara Robinson, Bobby Cheshire, Bobby Garrison, Carlos T. Chavez Nunez, Charles A. Sedillo, Eldon A. Knox, Fidel R. Archuleta, Jr., John W. Adams, Joseph Eric Mango, Kenneth J. Koval, Kevin J. Mastrianni, Kim Rose Ouellette, Montford Milton, Paulette Godet, Randy L. Aldrich, Renesco Johnson, Robert W. Purvis, Sammie R. Biller and William Graves
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv09340
Filed: December 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AND RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (872) Stipulation in case 4:18-cv-06972-JST; granting (15) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-09340-JST; granting (10) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-09576-JST; granting (8) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-10006-JST. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
January 10, 2022 Filing 15 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Dismissal of Claims and Responsive Pleadings filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 1/10/2022)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar Granting (869) STIPULATION CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR PRETRIAL PURPOSES in case 4:18-cv-06972-JST; (13) in case 4:21-cv-09340-JST; (8) in case 4:21-cv-09576-JST; (6) in case 4:21-cv-10006-JST. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
January 6, 2022 Filing 13 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR PRETRIAL PURPOSES filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 1/6/2022)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 1/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2022)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on 1/6/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2022)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/5/22. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/11/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2022 11:00 AM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 1-888-684-8852Access Code: 8583698The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2022)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 1/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2022)
January 4, 2022 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2022)
January 4, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kevin J. Mastrianni, Fidel R. Archuleta, Jr, Robert W. Purvis, Bobby Cheshire, Barbara Robinson, Sammie R. Biller, Montford Milton, Renesco Johnson, Eldon A. Knox, Bobby Garrison, Joseph Eric Mango, Kim Rose Ouellette, Randy L. Aldrich, Paulette Godet, John W. Adams, Carlos T. Chavez Nunez, William Graves, Kenneth J. Koval, Charles A. Sedillo. Service waived by Gilead Sciences, Inc. waiver sent on 1/4/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 1/4/2022)
January 3, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John W. Adams, Randy L. Aldrich, Fidel R. Archuleta, Jr, Sammie R. Biller, Carlos T. Chavez Nunez, Bobby Cheshire, Bobby Garrison, Paulette Godet, William Graves, Renesco Johnson, Eldon A. Knox, Kenneth J. Koval, Joseph Eric Mango, Kevin J. Mastrianni, Montford Milton, Kim Rose Ouellette, Robert W. Purvis, Barbara Robinson, Charles A. Sedillo.. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 1/3/2022)
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/3/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2021)
December 8, 2021 Reset Hearings re #3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order: Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/16/2022 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2021)
December 7, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kevin J. Mastrianni, Fidel R. Archuleta, Jr, Robert W. Purvis, Bobby Cheshire, Barbara Robinson, Sammie R. Biller, Montford Milton, Renesco Johnson, Eldon A. Knox, Bobby Garrison, Joseph Eric Mango, Kim Rose Ouellette, Randy L. Aldrich, Paulette Godet, John W. Adams, Carlos T. Chavez Nunez, William Graves, Kenneth J. Koval, Charles A. Sedillo. Service waived by Gilead Sciences, Inc. waiver sent on 12/7/2021, answer due 2/7/2022. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 12/7/2021)
December 3, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/9/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2021)
December 3, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/17/2021. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2021)
December 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gilead Sciences, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16684563.). Filed byKevin J. Mastrianni, Fidel R. Archuleta, Jr, Robert W. Purvis, Bobby Cheshire, Barbara Robinson, Sammie R. Biller, Montford Milton, Renesco Johnson, Eldon A. Knox, Bobby Garrison, Joseph Eric Mango, Kim Rose Ouellette, Randy L. Aldrich, Paulette Godet, John W. Adams, Carlos T. Chavez Nunez, William Graves, Kenneth J. Koval, Charles A. Sedillo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 12/3/2021)
December 3, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Please submit proposed summons for the Court to issue. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by William Graves, Sammie R. Biller, Fidel R. Archuleta, Jr., Barbara Robinson, Randy L. Aldrich, Bobby Garrison, John W. Adams, Charles A. Sedillo, Joseph Eric Mango, Paulette Godet, Kim Rose Ouellette, Bobby Cheshire, Carlos T. Chavez Nunez, Renesco Johnson, Kenneth J. Koval, Kevin J. Mastrianni, Robert W. Purvis, Eldon A. Knox, Montford Milton (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Robinson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Cheshire
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Garrison
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos T. Chavez Nunez
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A. Sedillo
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eldon A. Knox
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidel R. Archuleta, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W. Adams
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Eric Mango
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth J. Koval
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin J. Mastrianni
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Rose Ouellette
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montford Milton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulette Godet
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy L. Aldrich
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renesco Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W. Purvis
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sammie R. Biller
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Graves
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Eugene Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?