Urban v. Urban
Plaintiff: Scott T. Urban
Defendant: Craig T. Urban and Allied Consultant, Inc
Case Number: 4:2021cv09929
Filed: December 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2022 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 5/24/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/31/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advan ced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than May 27, 2022 by Noon.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ A>. Case Management Statement due by 5/24/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/31/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2022)
February 18, 2022 Filing 17 Case Reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 2/18/2022 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2022)
February 18, 2022 Filing 16 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2022)
February 18, 2022 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned.This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2022)
February 17, 2022 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Craig T. Urban.. (Dooley, Jedidiah) (Filed on 2/17/2022)
February 17, 2022 Filing 13 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Allied Consultant, Inc. (Do, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/17/2022) Modified on 2/17/2022 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2022 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Allied Consultant, Inc re #10 Answer to Complaint (Do, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/17/2022)
February 17, 2022 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. The correct event is 'Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge' located under the Other Filings/Oth er Documents category. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. [err101] Re: #13 Notice (Other) filed by Allied Consultant, Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2022)
February 15, 2022 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Craig T. Urban Disclosure of Non-Party Interested Entities or Persons (Dooley, Jedidiah) (Filed on 2/15/2022)
February 14, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint byAllied Consultant, Inc. (Do, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/14/2022)
February 14, 2022 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file the 'DISCLOSURE OF NON-PARTY INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS' as a sepa rate entry on the docket using the event 'Certificate of Interested Entities' located under the Other Filings/Notices category. Re: #10 Answer to Complaint filed by Allied Consultant, Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2022)
February 10, 2022 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 2/17/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2022)
February 10, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, #6 Summons Issued Stipulation for Extension of Time Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1 for Defendants to Respond to Complaint filed by Craig T. Urban. (Dooley, Jedidiah) (Filed on 2/10/2022)
January 4, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott T. Urban.. (Reimer, Pauline) (Filed on 1/4/2022)
December 29, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Craig T. Urban. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2021)
December 29, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Reimer, Pauline) (Filed on 12/29/2021)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott T. Urban (Reimer, Pauline) (Filed on 12/29/2021)
December 22, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/15/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/22/2022 01:30 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2021)
December 22, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/5/2022. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2021)
December 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Craig T Urban ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BCANDC-16744689.). Filed byScott T Urban. (Attachments: #1 * ERRONEOUS ENTRY. SEE #5 - Summons, #2 Declaration Notice of Interested Parties and/or Entities, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reimer, Pauline) (Filed on 12/22/2021) Modified on 12/29/2021 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety as a separate entry on the docket usi ng the event "Certificate of Interested Entities" found under the Other Filings/Notices category. Re:[1-2] Notice of Interested Parties and/or Entities, filed by Scott T. Urban. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2021)
December 22, 2021 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety completed with all necessary information and use the filing event 'PROPOSED SUMMONS' under the Other Filings/Other Documents category. Re:[1-1] Summons, filed by Scott T. Urban (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Urban v. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott T. Urban
Represented By: Pauline Ruth Reimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig T. Urban
Represented By: Jedidiah Lee Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Consultant, Inc
Represented By: Jonathan C. Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?