Richardson v. Russell
Plaintiff: Kevin Richardson
Defendant: Warden Russell
Case Number: 4:2022cv00148
Filed: January 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: PSLC GRC
2 Judge: PSLC JNE
3 Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kevin Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2022)
March 21, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amendment filed by Kevin Richardson. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2022)
March 21, 2022 Filing 21 Amendment filed by Kevin Richardson. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2022) Modified on 3/21/2022 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Kevin Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2022)
February 28, 2022 Filing 19 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.00, Receipt # 34611158533.) Filed byKevin Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Receipt for filing fee, #2 Envelope)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2022)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #13 PLAINTIFF EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE COMPLAINT/PETITION FORM AND IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION; AND DENYING PENDING PRE-TRIAL MOTIONS AS PREMATURE. Amended Complaint due by 3/14/2022. Amended Petition due by 3/14/2022.(amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
February 10, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION (Pretrial) filed by Kevin Richardson. Responses due by 3/10/2022. Replies due by 3/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2022)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 2/8/22. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REASSIGN CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/8/2022. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
February 7, 2022 Filing 14 REQUEST to Issue Summons by Kevin Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2022)
February 7, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Kevin Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2022)
February 1, 2022 Filing 12 Clerk's DECLINATION OF DEFAULT as to defendant Warden Russell. The request for default is premature. The court has not addressed a request for In Forma Pauperis or issued an order of service. (Related documents(s) #11 )(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
January 31, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Clerk filed by Kevin Richardson. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2022)
January 31, 2022 Filing 10 REQUEST for blank forms by Kevin Richardson. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2022)
January 27, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Writ of Execution or a Writ of Assistance filed by Kevin Richardson. Responses due by 2/24/2022. Replies due by 3/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2022)
January 27, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Writ of Attachment or Writ of Sequestration filed by Kevin Richardson. Responses due by 2/24/2022. Replies due by 3/10/2022. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2022)
January 27, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Discovery filed by Kevin Richardson. Responses due by 2/24/2022. Replies due by 3/10/2022. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2022)
January 27, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Kevin Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2022)
January 27, 2022 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kevin Richardson. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2022)
January 11, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
January 11, 2022 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE Petition on Form due by 2/18/2022. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
January 11, 2022 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 2/18/2022. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
January 7, 2022 Filing 1 Ex Parte Application filed by Kevin Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?