Causey v. Alameda County Superior Court
Petitioner: Lamar Causey
Respondent: Alameda County Superior Court
Case Number: 4:2022cv00265
Filed: January 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC GRC
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/15/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
January 26, 2022 Filing 3 Prison Trust Fund Account Statement. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2022)
January 13, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lamar Causey, CDCR # BP0735.The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2022) Modified on 1/19/2022 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed by Lamar Causey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2022) Modified on 1/19/2022 (wsn, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Causey v. Alameda County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lamar Causey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alameda County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?