Kinder et al v. DJI Technology, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joe Kinder and Brandon Moss
Defendant: DJI Technology, Inc. and SZ DJI Technology Co., LTD.
Case Number: 4:2022cv00601
Filed: January 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2023 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Parties are hereby notified that the initial case management conference previously set for 4/11/2023 is continued to 8/15/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland this proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Updated joint case management statement due by 8/8/2023. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/kaw General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom guidance and setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2023)
April 4, 2023 Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Joe Kinder, Brandon Moss. (Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 4/4/2023)
December 2, 2022 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE: You are hereby notified the initial case management conference previously set for 12/6/2022 is continued to 4/11/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, this proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. An updated joint case management statement is due by 4/4/2023.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/kaw General Or der 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom guidance and setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2022)
November 29, 2022 Filing 21 Plaintiff's CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Joe Kinder, Brandon Moss. (Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 11/29/2022) Modified on 11/29/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying #16 Motion for Electronic Service of Process. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2022)
August 30, 2022 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE: You are hereby notified that the hearing set for 9/1/2022 at 1:30pm re: #16 motion for electronic service of process pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3)) is vacated. Court finds that the matter is appropriate for resolution without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2022)
July 27, 2022 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE: You are hereby notified that the initial case management conference previously set for 8/2/2022 is continued to 12/6/2022 at 1:30pm, this proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. An updated joint case management statement due by 11/29/2022. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/kaw General Order 5 8. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2022)
July 19, 2022 Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Joe Kinder, Brandon Moss. (Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 7/19/2022)
July 13, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) filed by Joe Kinder, Brandon Moss. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 7/27/2022. Replies due by 8/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Reuben D. Nathan in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Electronic Service of Process, #2 Proposed Order)(Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 7/13/2022)
May 25, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant, DJI Technology, Inc., ONLY, Without Prejudice by Joe Kinder, Brandon Moss (Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 5/25/2022)
May 18, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (re #1 Complaint) filed by DJI Technology, Inc., Brandon Moss and Joe Kinder. (Wong, Andrew) (Filed on 5/18/2022) Modified on 5/19/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joe Kinder, Brandon Moss OF SUMMONS (Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 4/28/2022)
April 27, 2022 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE: You are hereby notified that the further case management conference previously set for 5/3/2022 has been continued to 8/2/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. A joint case management statement is due by 7/26/2022.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/kaw Gen eral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document assoc iated with this entry.) (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2022)
April 26, 2022 Filing 11 PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Joe Kinder, Brandon Moss. (Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 4/26/2022) Modified on 4/27/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2022 Filing 10 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 4/12/2022)
April 12, 2022 Filing 9 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 4/12/2022)
February 7, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joe Kinder, Brandon Moss.. (Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 2/7/2022)
January 31, 2022 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/26/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2022)
January 31, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to DJI Technology, Inc., SZ DJI Technology Co., LTD. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2022)
January 31, 2022 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/14/2022. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2022)
January 28, 2022 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Joe Kinder, Brandon Moss (Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 1/28/2022)
January 28, 2022 Filing 3 DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF JOE KINDER RE: VENUE PURSUANT TO CAL. CIV. CODE 1780(d) by Joe Kinder. (Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 1/28/2022) Modified on 1/31/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 1/28/2022)
January 28, 2022 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16853054). Filed by Joe Kinder, Brandon Moss. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 1/28/2022) Modified on 1/31/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinder et al v. DJI Technology, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Kinder
Represented By: Reuben D. Nathan
Represented By: John Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Moss
Represented By: Reuben D. Nathan
Represented By: John Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DJI Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew S Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SZ DJI Technology Co., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?