Bollegraaf Patents and Brands B.V. et al v. Polymeric Technology, INC., A California Corporation.
Plaintiff: Bollegraaf Patents and Brands B.V., Bollegraaf Recycling Machinery B.V., Lubo Systems B.V., Lubo USA, LLC and Van Dyk Baler Corp.
Defendant: Polymeric Technology, INC., A California Corporation.
Case Number: 4:2022cv01687
Filed: March 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2022 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Polymeric Technology, INC., A California Corporation. (Muehlhauser, Douglas) (Filed on 5/13/2022)
May 13, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byPolymeric Technology, INC., A California Corporation.. (Muehlhauser, Douglas) (Filed on 5/13/2022)
April 22, 2022 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for June 21, 2022, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by June 14th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:22-cv-01687-HSG. The June 21st proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2022)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2022)
April 21, 2022 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2022)
April 21, 2022 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Polymeric Technology, INC., A California Corporation... (Muehlhauser, Douglas) (Filed on 4/21/2022)
April 7, 2022 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. Defendants are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 4/21/2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2022)
April 5, 2022 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint [L.R. 6-1(a)] filed by Polymeric Technology, INC., A California Corporation.. (Muehlhauser, Douglas) (Filed on 4/5/2022)
March 30, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bollegraaf Patents and Brands B.V., Bollegraaf Recycling Machinery B.V., Lubo Systems B.V., Lubo USA, LLC, Van Dyk Baler Corp... (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 3/30/2022)
March 16, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Polymeric Technology, INC., A California Corporation. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2022) Modified on 3/17/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2022 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/8/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2022)
March 16, 2022 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/30/2022. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2022)
March 16, 2022 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Patent and Trademarks (cc: form mailed to register). (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 3/16/2022)
March 16, 2022 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Bollegraaf Patents and Brands B.V., Bollegraaf Recycling Machinery B.V., Lubo Systems B.V., Lubo USA, LLC, Van Dyk Baler Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Bollegraaf Netherlands Holding B.V. for Bollegraaf Recycling Machinery B.V., Lubo Systems B.V.; Corporate Parent Bollegraaf Holding Appingdam B.V. for Bollegraaf Patents and Brands B.V.. re #1 Complaint,, (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 3/16/2022)
March 16, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 3/16/2022)
March 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint for (1) Patent Infringement, (2) Federal Trademark Infringement, (3) False Designation of Origin, (4) Common Law Trademark Infringement, (5) Unfair Competition and Business Practices Under California State Law, (6) False and Misleading Advertising Under California State Law, and (7) Unfair Competition Under California Common Law against Polymeric Technology, INC., A California Corporation. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16999066.). Filed byLubo USA, LLC, Bollegraaf Patents and Brands B.V., Lubo Systems B.V., Bollegraaf Recycling Machinery B.V., Van Dyk Baler Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 3/16/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bollegraaf Patents and Brands B.V. et al v. Polymeric Technology, INC., A California Corporation.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bollegraaf Patents and Brands B.V.
Represented By: Nicholas A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bollegraaf Recycling Machinery B.V.
Represented By: Nicholas A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lubo Systems B.V.
Represented By: Nicholas A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lubo USA, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van Dyk Baler Corp.
Represented By: Nicholas A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polymeric Technology, INC., A California Corporation.
Represented By: Douglas Glen Muehlhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?