Rouse v. Internal Revenue Service
Petitioner: Edward Lee Rouse, Jr.
Respondent: Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 4:2022cv01944
Filed: March 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC AGB
Referring Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2022 Filing 8 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/5/2022. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/5/2022. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 27, 2022 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Service. Filed byEdward Lee Rouse, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2022)
April 25, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Edward Lee Rouse, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2022)
March 28, 2022 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 5/5/2022. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 28, 2022 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE Complaint on Form due by 5/5/2022. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 3/30/2022 (ljf, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2022 Filing 1 Letter from Edward Lee Rouse, Jr.. re: the IRS. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2022) Modified on 3/28/2022 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rouse v. Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edward Lee Rouse, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?