Almaqousi v. Renaud et al
Plaintiff: Eman Almaqousi
Defendant: Tracy Renaud, Ur M Jaddou and Alejandro Mayorkas
Case Number: 4:2022cv02254
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2022 Filing 9 REMARK: The court has received Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss #8 . Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A), no court order is required to dismiss this action. The parties are hereby notified that this matter is terminated. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2022)
May 11, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eman Almaqousi. Responses due by 5/25/2022. Replies due by 6/1/2022. (Jobson, Cara) (Filed on 5/11/2022)
May 11, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Eman Almaqousi.. (Jobson, Cara) (Filed on 5/11/2022)
May 11, 2022 Filing 6 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/25/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2022)
April 26, 2022 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/10/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 4 COMPLAINT by Eman Almaqousi. Amendment to #1 Complaint . (Jobson, Cara) (Filed on 4/11/2022) Modified on 4/11/2022 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2022 Filing 3 Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/25/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Eman Almaqousi against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17075208.). Filed byEman Almaqousi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jobson, Cara) (Filed on 4/11/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Almaqousi v. Renaud et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eman Almaqousi
Represented By: Cara Margaret Jobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Renaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?