Slovak v. Wheeler
Plaintiff: Robert A Slovak
Defendant: Lynn Wheeler, Lynn Slovak, Lynn Dorrington, Lynn Reardon and Lynn Arlidge
Case Number: 4:2022cv02502
Filed: April 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2022 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Notice is hereby given that the case management conference previously set for 8/8/2022 is continued to 8/22/2022 at 2:00 p.m. A joint case management statement is due by 8/15/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.usco urts.gov/ygr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2022. Ini tial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2022)
May 18, 2022 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr General Order 58. Per sons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2022 02: 00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2022)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan Van Keulen no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 5/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2022)
May 18, 2022 Filing 11 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2022)
May 18, 2022 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2022)
May 18, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Robert A Slovak.. (Pankopf, Tory) (Filed on 5/18/2022)
May 16, 2022 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/31/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2022)
April 25, 2022 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/19/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/26/2022 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2022)
April 25, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Lynn Wheeler. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2022)
April 25, 2022 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/9/2022. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2022)
April 25, 2022 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Pankopf, Tory) (Filed on 4/25/2022)
April 25, 2022 Filing 3 Amended Civil Cover Sheet by Robert A Slovak. (Pankopf, Tory) (Filed on 4/25/2022) Modified on 4/26/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Robert A Slovak . (Pankopf, Tory) (Filed on 4/24/2022)
April 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17113911.). Filed byRobert A Slovak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" Slovak Family 1991 Trust, #2 Exhibit "2" Appointment of Trustee, #3 Exhibit "3" Death Certificate, #4 Exhibit "4" List of Converted Assets)(Pankopf, Tory) (Filed on 4/24/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slovak v. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Slovak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Dorrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Reardon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Arlidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A Slovak
Represented By: Scott D. Johannessen
Represented By: Tory M. Pankopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?