OptraHealth, Inc. v. Invitae Corporation
Plaintiff: OptraHealth, Inc.
Defendant: Invitae Corporation
Case Number: 4:2022cv03002
Filed: May 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Erin Kelly. #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice terminated, re-filed at Docket No. #20 . (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2022)
July 8, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17333683.) filed by Invitae Corporation. (Kelly, Erin) (Filed on 7/8/2022)
July 7, 2022 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE RE DOCKET NO. #18 : The California State Bar Number for local counsel does not match the number registered in the Court's ECF system. The email address for applicant does not match the email address listed on the docket. Counsel is directed to re-file a new application. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2022)
July 6, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17326809.) filed by Invitae Corporation. (Kelly, Erin) (Filed on 7/6/2022)
July 6, 2022 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Telephonic Case Management Conference has been set for July 26, 2022, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., Case Management Statement due by July 19, 2022. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2022)
June 22, 2022 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for October 4, 2022, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by September 27th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:22-cv-03002-HSG. The October 4th proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2022) Modified on 6/22/2022 to correct typo (ndr, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings re #14 Notice of Pendency of Other Actions Involving Same Patent Pursuant to Patent Local Rule 2-1(A). Judge Beth Labson Freeman no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 6/22/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2022)
June 21, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by OptraHealth, Inc. (Zhen, Chris) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
June 13, 2022 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 9/22/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/29/2022 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2022)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 6/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2022)
June 7, 2022 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2022)
June 7, 2022 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Invitae Corporation.. (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/7/2022)
June 7, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Lee Marshall (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/7/2022)
June 6, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by OptraHealth, Inc.. Service waived by Invitae Corporation waiver sent on 5/25/2022, answer due 7/25/2022. (Zhen, Chris) (Filed on 6/6/2022)
May 24, 2022 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/7/2022. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2022)
May 24, 2022 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet by OptraHealth, Inc. . (Zhen, Chris) (Filed on 5/24/2022)
May 24, 2022 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet by OptraHealth, Inc. . (Zhen, Chris) (Filed on 5/24/2022)
May 24, 2022 Filer did not include venue on Civil Cover Sheet. No judge will be assigned until appropriate changes are made. #Electronic filing error. Re: #5 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Optr aHealth, Inc. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2022)
May 23, 2022 Incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used, document not flattened. No judge assignment will be made until the appropriate changes have been made.#Electronic filing error. Re: #1 Complaint , filed by OptraHealth, Inc. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2022)
May 20, 2022 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Zhen, Chris) (Filed on 5/20/2022)
May 20, 2022 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Zhen, Chris) (Filed on 5/20/2022)
May 20, 2022 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by OptraHealth, Inc. certifying no such interest to report (Zhen, Chris) (Filed on 5/20/2022)
May 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand for Patent Infringement against Invitae Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17197235.). Filed by OptraHealth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Patent 10,754,882, #2 Exhibit Invitae GIA Product, #3 Exhibit Invitae Press Release, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zhen, Chris) (Filed on 5/20/2022) Modified on 5/23/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OptraHealth, Inc. v. Invitae Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OptraHealth, Inc.
Represented By: Chris J Zhen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invitae Corporation
Represented By: Erin Anne Kelly
Represented By: Kenneth Lee Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?