Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 69.181.127.51
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 69.181.127.51
Case Number: 4:2022cv03340
Filed: June 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #8 Ex Parte Application #8 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2022)
July 6, 2022 Filing 8 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D Declarations in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 7/6/2022)
June 8, 2022 Filing 7 Amended Civil Cover Sheet by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC . (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 6/8/2022)
June 8, 2022 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2022)
June 8, 2022 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2022)
June 8, 2022 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 6/8/2022)
June 8, 2022 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 6/8/2022)
June 8, 2022 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC, Other Affiliate John Doe, Defendant for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 6/8/2022)
June 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement - Demand for Jury Trial against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 69.181.127.51 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17245235.). Filed byStrike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 6/8/2022)
June 8, 2022 Copy of #4 report emailed to copyright office (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 69.181.127.51
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln Dee Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 69.181.127.51
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?