Sayyedalhosseini v. U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Oakland Local Office et al
Plaintiff: Sonia Sayyedalhosseini
Defendant: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Oakland Local Office and U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, San Francisco District Office
Case Number: 4:2022cv03367
Filed: June 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Amended Pleadings due by 8/10/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 11, 2022 Filing 8 Letter of clarification from Sonia Sayyedalhosseini. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2022)
July 11, 2022 Filing 7 Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 34611160344. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2022)
June 8, 2022 Filing 6 **CLERICAL ERROR. IFP IS PENDING #2 . PLEASE DISREGARD.*** Summons Issued as to U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission - Oakland, U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission - San Francisco. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2022) Modified on 6/23/2022 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2022 Filing 5 *** FILED IN ERROR*** SEE DKT. #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sonia Sayyedalhosseini. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2022) Modified on 6/10/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/10/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/23/2022 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2022 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 8, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2022)
June 8, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sonia Sayyedalhosseini. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2022)
June 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission Oakland, U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission San Francisco. Filed b by Sonia Sayyedalhosseini. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2022) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2022: #1 Exhibit, # 1.1 Exhibit, # 1.2 Exhibit. (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2022: # 2 Exhibit, # 2.1 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # , # 6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit. Modified on 6/10/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sayyedalhosseini v. U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Oakland Local Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Sayyedalhosseini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Oakland Local Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, San Francisco District Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?