Saechao v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Kownai Saechao
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 4:2022cv03410
Filed: June 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2022 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kilolo Kijakazi.. (Illarmo, Marcelo) (Filed on 7/16/2022)
June 29, 2022 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kownai Saechao.. (Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 6/29/2022)
June 29, 2022 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/13/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2022)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for all further proceedings re #9 Order Relating Cases. Judge Edward J. Davila no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 6/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2022)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RELATING CASE: Cases 4:19-cv-04396-DMR Kownai Saechao v. Andrew M. Saul and 5:22-cv-03410-EJD Kownai Saechao v. Kilojo Kijakazi are related. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/28/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2022)
June 15, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2022)
June 15, 2022 Service packet delivered to SSA and the U.S. Marshal via email (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2022)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/14/2022. Clerk to Issue Summons and arrange service. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2022)
June 10, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT For Judicial Review of Decision of Commissioner of Social Security against Kilolo Kijakazi. Filed byKownai Saechao. (Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 6/10/2022)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Denying #2 Without Prejudice Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Amended Complaint due 7/31/2022. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/10/2022. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2022)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER (Social Security Review Action) (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2022)
June 9, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Edward J. Davila. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2022)
June 9, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kownai Saechao. (Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 6/9/2022)
June 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Judicial Review of Decision of Commissioner of Social Security (Administrative Procedure Act Case) against Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security . Filed by Kownai Saechao. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 6/9/2022) Modified on 6/9/2022 (tn, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saechao v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kownai Saechao
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Marcelo N. Illarmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?