Burden v. Serafin et al
Plaintiff: Charmaine S Burden and Charmaine S. Burden
Defendant: Serafin Robert, Serafin Madeline, Robert Serafin and Madeline Serafin
Case Number: 4:2022cv03479
Filed: June 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2022 Filing 21 First CROSSCLAIM against Madeline Serafin. Filed by Robert Serafin. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Serafin, Robert) (Filed on 8/8/2022) Modified on 8/9/2022 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2022 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Madeline Serafin re #14 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #15 Counterclaim, #19 Consent/Declination. (Fuerch, Stephen) (Filed on 8/8/2022) Modified on 8/9/2022 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2022 Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Madeline Serafin.. (Fuerch, Stephen) (Filed on 8/8/2022)
August 8, 2022 Filing 18 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT MADELINE SERAFIN Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Madeline Serafin shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/22/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 4, 2022 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Robert Serafin. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2022)
August 4, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint byRobert Serafin. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2022)
August 2, 2022 Filing 15 CROSSCLAIM against Robert Serafin. Filed byMadeline Serafin. (Fuerch, Stephen) (Filed on 8/2/2022) Modified on 8/3/2022 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand. Filed by Madeline Serafin byMadeline Serafin. (Fuerch, Stephen) (Filed on 8/2/2022) Modified on 8/3/2022 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2022 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT MADELINE SERAFIN Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Madeline Serafin shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/5/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2022)
July 21, 2022 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE re: Docket No. #10 : Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(a), parties may stipulate to extend the time within which to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint without a court order provided the change will not alter the date of any event or any deadline already fixed by Court order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2022)
July 20, 2022 Filing 11 STIPULATION To Extend time for Robert Serafin to Respond to Complaint filed by Charmaine S. Burden. (Lapping, Richard) (Filed on 7/20/2022)
July 20, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extension to File Answer filed by Madeline Serafin. (Fuerch, Stephen) (Filed on 7/20/2022)
July 7, 2022 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. The correct event is ' SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED' .[err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #8 Certificate of Service filed by Charmaine S. Burden, #9 Certificate of Service filed by Charmaine S. Burden. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2022)
July 6, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Charmaine S. Burden. Madeline Serafin served on 6/30/22, answer due 7/21/22. (Lapping, Richard) (Filed on 7/6/2022) Modified on 7/7/2022 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Charmaine S. Burden. Robert Serafin served on 6/30/22, answer due 7/21/22. (Lapping, Richard) (Filed on 7/6/2022) Modified on 7/7/2022 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Charmaine S. Burden.. (Lapping, Richard) (Filed on 6/24/2022)
June 14, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Madeline Serafin, Serafin Robert Serafin. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2022)
June 14, 2022 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2022 01:30 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2022)
June 14, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/28/2022. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2022)
June 14, 2022 #Electronic filing error. Filer is reminded to enter parties' names correctly. Robert Serafin has been entered as Serafin Robert and Madeline Serafin entered as Serafin Ma deline. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Charmaine S. Burden. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2022)
June 13, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Lapping, Richard) (Filed on 6/13/2022)
June 13, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Charmaine S Burden . (Lapping, Richard) (Filed on 6/13/2022)
June 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17259872.). Filed byCharmaine S Burden. (Lapping, Richard) (Filed on 6/13/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burden v. Serafin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charmaine S Burden
Represented By: Richard A. Lapping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charmaine S. Burden
Represented By: Richard A. Lapping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serafin Robert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serafin Madeline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Serafin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madeline Serafin
Represented By: Stephen M. Fuerch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?