Ortiz v. Perkins & Co et al
Plaintiff: Alice Ortiz
Defendant: Perkins & Co and Perkins & Company, P.C.
Case Number: 4:2022cv03506
Filed: June 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Perkins & Co, Perkins & Company, P.C.. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 8/25/2022. Replies due by 9/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A)(Monagle, James) (Filed on 8/11/2022)
August 2, 2022 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Perkins & Co, Perkins & Company, P.C... (Monagle, James) (Filed on 8/2/2022)
August 2, 2022 Filing 13 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Perkins & Co, Perkins & Company, P.C. (Monagle, James) (Filed on 8/2/2022)
July 19, 2022 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/2/2022. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2022)
July 19, 2022 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Alice Ortiz.. (Cole, Scott) (Filed on 7/19/2022)
July 8, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond filed by Perkins & Co, Perkins & Company, P.C.. (Monagle, James) (Filed on 7/8/2022)
June 22, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Alice Ortiz.. (Cole, Scott) (Filed on 6/22/2022)
June 17, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Perkins & Co, Perkins & Company, P.C.. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2022)
June 17, 2022 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Bolce, Cody) (Filed on 6/17/2022)
June 17, 2022 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Bolce, Cody) (Filed on 6/17/2022)
June 17, 2022 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/6/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2022)
June 17, 2022 #Electronic filing error. ONLY ONE SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED, USE AN ATTACHMENT TO SUMMONS IF NEEDED TO LIST ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS INFORMATION [err201]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Alice Ortiz, #3 Proposed Summons filed by Alice Ortiz
June 17, 2022 #Electronic filing error. ONLY ONE SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED PER CASE, USE AN ATTACHMENT TO SUMMONS IF NEEDED TO LIST ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS INFORMATION [err201] This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Alice Ortiz, Re: #6 Proposed Summons filed by Alice Ortiz (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2022)
June 14, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/28/2022. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2022)
June 14, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Bolce, Cody) (Filed on 6/14/2022)
June 14, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Bolce, Cody) (Filed on 6/14/2022)
June 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17263893.). Filed byAlice Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bolce, Cody) (Filed on 6/14/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Perkins & Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Ortiz
Represented By: Cody Alexander Bolce
Represented By: Scott Edward Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perkins & Co
Represented By: James Francis Monagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perkins & Company, P.C.
Represented By: James Francis Monagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?