Colley v. SNAPMEDTECH, INC.
Plaintiff: Cindy Colley
Defendant: SNAPMEDTECH, INC. and SNAPMEDTECH, INC. doing business as SnapNurse, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2022cv03884
Filed: June 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #18 STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS #13 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Responses due by 9/16/2022 and Replies due by 10/21/2022. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/9/2022. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2022)
August 2, 2022 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by SNAPMEDTECH, INC.. (Ebrahimi, Vana) (Filed on 8/2/2022)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #16 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2022)
July 22, 2022 Filing 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order filed by Cindy Colley. (Highman, Bruce) (Filed on 7/22/2022)
July 20, 2022 Filing 15 Proposed Order re #13 MOTION to Amend/Correct for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Cindy Colley. (Highman, Bruce) (Filed on 7/20/2022)
July 20, 2022 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE DOCKET NO. #13 . In the future when filing a motion for leave to file, the correct event to use is Leave to File Document located under Motions-General under the Motions and Related Filings category. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2022)
July 19, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Cindy Colley. Motion Hearing set for 1/5/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 8/2/2022. Replies due by 8/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bruce J. Highman in Support of Motionfor leave to File Second Amended Complaint)(Highman, Bruce) (Filed on 7/19/2022)
July 14, 2022 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by SNAPMEDTECH, INC... (Ebrahimi, Vana) (Filed on 7/14/2022)
July 5, 2022 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Telephonic Case Management Conference has been set for October 4, 2022, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., Case Management Statement due by September 27, 2022. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-03884-HSG. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2022)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Signed by The Clerk on 07/05/2022. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2022)
July 5, 2022 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2022)
July 1, 2022 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cindy Colley. (Highman, Bruce) (Filed on 7/1/2022)
July 1, 2022 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cindy Colley (Highman, Bruce) (Filed on 7/1/2022)
July 1, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cindy Colley.. (Highman, Bruce) (Filed on 7/1/2022)
July 1, 2022 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/27/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2022)
June 30, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/14/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2022)
June 30, 2022 Filing 1 Answer to Removal Complaint (see Exhibit 3 to Removal Complaint) by SNAPMEDTECH, Inc. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2022) Modified on 7/1/2022 (sfb, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SNAPMEDTECH, INC. (Ebrahimi, Vana) (Filed on 6/30/2022)
June 30, 2022 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by SNAPMEDTECH, INC. (Ebrahimi, Vana) (Filed on 6/30/2022)
June 30, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sonoma County Superior Court. Their case number is SCV-270782,. (Filing fee $402 receipt number BCANDC-17314023). Filed bySNAPMEDTECH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration)(Ebrahimi, Vana) (Filed on 6/30/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colley v. SNAPMEDTECH, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Colley
Represented By: Bruce J. Highman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SNAPMEDTECH, INC.
Represented By: Vana Ebrahimi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SNAPMEDTECH, INC. doing business as SnapNurse, Inc.
Represented By: Vana Ebrahimi
Represented By: Lonnie D. Giamela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?