Ariza et al v. Concesionaria Vuela Compania de Aviacion S.A.P.I. de C.V.
Plaintiff: Ubaldo Ariza, Veronica Garcia, Ubaldo Ariza Cabrera and Veronica Garcia Prieto
Defendant: Concesionaria Vuela Compania de Aviacion S.A.P.I. de C.V. doing business as Volaris
Case Number: 4:2022cv04156
Filed: July 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE by Ubaldo Ariza, Veronica Garcia OF UNAVAILABILITY OF ARNOLD I. BERSCHLER (Berschler, Arnold) (Filed on 9/9/2022)
August 8, 2022 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ubaldo Ariza, Veronica Garcia (Berschler, Arnold) (Filed on 8/8/2022)
August 1, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Veronica Garcia.. (Berschler, Arnold) (Filed on 8/1/2022)
August 1, 2022 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff Veronica Garcia shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/15/2022. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2022)
July 29, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ubaldo Ariza, Veronica Garcia.. (Berschler, Arnold) (Filed on 7/29/2022)
July 17, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Concesionaria Vuela Compania de Aviacion S.A.P.I. de C.V.. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2022)
July 17, 2022 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2022)
July 15, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2022. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2022)
July 15, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Berschler, Arnold) (Filed on 7/15/2022)
July 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against Concesionaria Vuela Compania de Aviacion S.A.P.I. de C.V. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17355985.). Filed byUbaldo Ariza, Veronica Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berschler, Arnold) (Filed on 7/15/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ariza et al v. Concesionaria Vuela Compania de Aviacion S.A.P.I. de C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ubaldo Ariza
Represented By: Arnold I. Berschler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Garcia
Represented By: Arnold I. Berschler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ubaldo Ariza Cabrera
Represented By: Arnold I. Berschler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Garcia Prieto
Represented By: Arnold I. Berschler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concesionaria Vuela Compania de Aviacion S.A.P.I. de C.V. doing business as Volaris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?