Xelan Prop 1 LLC et al v. City and County of San Francisco
Plaintiff: Xelan Prop 1 LLC, Renka Prop LLC, Nozari 2 LLC, Zoriall LLC, Verpresar LLC, Camierda 1 LLC, Jambax 2 LLC, Katoka 5 LLC and Anne Kihagi
Defendant: CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, Michael Weiss and Peter Keith
Case Number: 4:2022cv04456
Filed: August 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Violation 5th & 8th Amendment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2022 #Electronic filing error and request for correct e-filing errors by 08/10/2022.Prior notifications requesting correction of e-filing errors were sent on 08/02/2022. To da te, no follow up has been made to correct the e-filing error in this case.The case is temporarily closed until the deficiency has been corrected. The deadline to make the e-filing corrections is 08/10/2022. Please correct the following e-filing error:E-FILING ERROR NO.1: Submit the correct civil cover sheet. Our form, Civil Cover Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/2020), is found our website www.cand.uscourts.gov. Submit your corrected document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. No judge assignment will be made until the corrected document is e-filed. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2022)
August 2, 2022 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached. Nature of Suit on the docket does not match the Nature of Suit on the Civil Cover Sheet. [err201] Resubmit current Civil Cover Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/2020) from our website www.cand.uscourts.gov. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. Please re-file civil cover sheet in its entirety. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Xelan Prop 1 LLC. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2022) Modified on 8/2/2022 (mbc, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violations 42 USC 1983, 1985 against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17402216.). Filed byXelan Prop 1 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons with 2 attachments, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Uchiyama, Karen) (Filed on 8/1/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xelan Prop 1 LLC et al v. City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xelan Prop 1 LLC
Represented By: Karen Y. Uchiyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renka Prop LLC
Represented By: Karen Y. Uchiyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nozari 2 LLC
Represented By: Karen Y. Uchiyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zoriall LLC
Represented By: Karen Y. Uchiyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verpresar LLC
Represented By: Karen Y. Uchiyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camierda 1 LLC
Represented By: Karen Y. Uchiyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jambax 2 LLC
Represented By: Karen Y. Uchiyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katoka 5 LLC
Represented By: Karen Y. Uchiyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Kihagi
Represented By: Karen Y. Uchiyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?