Newberry v. Meta Platforms et al
Plaintiff: Lekeviya Newberry
Defendant: Meta Platforms, FACEBOOK HOLDDINGS, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram LLC, SICUKUS, INC, ByteDance Inc., Snap Inc., Tiktok Inc., Facebook Holdings, LLC, Siculus, Inc., ByteDance, Ltd., TikTok, Ltd. and TikTok, LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv06460
Filed: October 24, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2023 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to ByteDance, Ltd., TikTok, LLC, TikTok, Ltd.. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2023)
April 4, 2023 Filing 18 Proposed Summons. (VanZandt, Joseph) (Filed on 4/4/2023)
April 4, 2023 Filing 17 COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against ByteDance Inc., Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Instagram LLC, Meta Platforms, Snap Inc., Tiktok Inc., Siculus, Inc., ByteDance, Ltd., TikTok, Ltd., TikTok, LLC. Filed byLekeviya Newberry. (VanZandt, Joseph) (Filed on 4/4/2023)
November 17, 2022 Filing 16 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/09/2022, before Judge Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, email address Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing., TRANSCRIPT COPY DELIVERED Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2023. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 11/17/2022)
October 25, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lekeviya Newberry. Tiktok Inc. served on 10/5/2022, answer due 10/26/2022. (Richardson, Clinton) (Filed on 10/25/2022)
October 25, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lekeviya Newberry. Snap Inc. served on 10/5/2022, answer due 10/26/2022. (Richardson, Clinton) (Filed on 10/25/2022)
October 25, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lekeviya Newberry. ByteDance Inc. served on 10/5/2022, answer due 10/26/2022. (Richardson, Clinton) (Filed on 10/25/2022)
October 24, 2022 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE. This case is reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for coordination with In re: Social Media Adolescent Addiction/Personal Injury Products, No. 4:22-md-03047 consistent with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Transfer Order and the Order Setting Initial Conference in this District. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2022)
October 24, 2022 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Western; Case Number 2:22-cv-02654. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 20, 2022 Filing 10 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) MDL No. 3047. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 10/19/2022. (agj)
September 28, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lekeviya Newberry. Meta Platforms waiver sent on 9/28/2022, answer due 11/28/2022. (Parish, Danny)
September 27, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to BYTEDANCE INC., SNAP INC., TIKTOK INC.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (agj)
September 27, 2022 Filing 7 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint filed by Lekeviya Newberry has been filed. For future reference, please note the civil cover sheet is not signed. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (agj)
September 26, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj)
September 26, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj)
September 26, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj)
September 26, 2022 Filing 3 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (agj)
September 26, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Summons by Danny Parish on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Parish, Danny)
September 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3976961), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parish, Danny)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newberry v. Meta Platforms et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lekeviya Newberry
Represented By: Danny Parish
Represented By: Clinton K. Richardson
Represented By: Joseph Glenn VanZandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Platforms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FACEBOOK HOLDDINGS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Operations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Payments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Instagram LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SICUKUS, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ByteDance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snap Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiktok Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siculus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ByteDance, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TikTok, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TikTok, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?