Kenneth Little as Administrator of the Estates of William Tealer and Jessie M. Tealer v. Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Plaintiff: Kenneth Little as Administrator of the Estates of William Tealer and Jessie M. Tealer
Defendant: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 4:2022cv07072
Filed: November 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2022 Filing 20 REPLY (re #10 Defendant Freedom Mortgage Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint: Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byFreedom Mortgage Corporation. (Johnson, Nicole) (Filed on 12/14/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 19 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 Defendant Freedom Mortgage Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint: Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed by Kenneth Little as Administrator of the Estates of William Tealer and Jessie M. Tealer. (Cara, Anthony) (Filed on 12/7/2022) Modified on 12/8/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2022 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MOTION HEARING. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #10 Defendant Freedom Mortgage Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint: Memorandum of Points and Authorities. Case Management Statement due by 3/7/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.us courts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than February 8, 2023 by 2:00 p.m for the Motion hearing and March 13, 2023 by 2:00 p.m. for the CMC.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 3/7/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2022)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 12/01/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2022)
December 1, 2022 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2022)
December 1, 2022 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kenneth Little as Administrator of the Estates of William Tealer and Jessie M. Tealer.. (Cara, Anthony) (Filed on 12/1/2022)
December 1, 2022 Filing 14 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/7/2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/7/2022. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2 022)
November 30, 2022 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Freedom Mortgage Corporation.. (Johnson, Nicole) (Filed on 11/30/2022)
November 23, 2022 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/30/2022. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2022)
November 23, 2022 Filing 11 Defendant Freedom Mortgage Corporation's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Substitution of Trustee)(Related document(s) #10 ) (Johnson, Nicole) (Filed on 11/23/2022) Modified on 11/23/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2022 Filing 10 Defendant Freedom Mortgage Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint: Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 12/29/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 12/7/2022. Replies due by 12/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Nicole) (Filed on 11/23/2022) Modified on 11/23/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #8 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Deadline for Defendant to file a response to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended to 12/19/2022. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2022)
November 17, 2022 Filing 8 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation and Kenneth Little as Administrator of the Estates of William Tealer and Jessie M. Tealer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Nicole) (Filed on 11/17/2022) Modified on 11/18/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Freedom Mortgage Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, (Johnson, Nicole) (Filed on 11/17/2022)
November 15, 2022 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/2/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/9/2023 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2022)
November 14, 2022 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/28/2022. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2022)
November 10, 2022 Filing 4 Freedom Mortgage Corporation's Request for Judicial Notice in support of Notice of Removal filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Assessors Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - Judicial Caseload Profile, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2023 Fair Market Rent Documentation System, #4 Exhibit 4 - Zillow Search, #5 Exhibit 5 - Transaction History Report)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Johnson, Nicole) (Filed on 11/10/2022) Modified on 11/15/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Johnson, Nicole) (Filed on 11/10/2022)
November 10, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Freedom Mortgage Corporation . (Johnson, Nicole) (Filed on 11/10/2022)
November 10, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-22-602162. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-17718725). Filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Verification of Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice to Plaintiff, #4 Exhibit 4 - State Court Docket)(Johnson, Nicole) (Filed on 11/10/2022) Modified on 11/15/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenneth Little as Administrator of the Estates of William Tealer and Jessie M. Tealer v. Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Little as Administrator of the Estates of William Tealer and Jessie M. Tealer
Represented By: Anthony Paul Cara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Nicole Michelle Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?