Johnson v. Sanchez et al
Plaintiff: Paul David Johnson
Defendant: Correctional Officer Sanchez, Lieutenant Boise and R. Broomfield
Case Number: 4:2022cv07858
Filed: December 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC JNE
Referring Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2023 Filing 9 USCA Case Number 23-15145 9th Circuit for #8 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by Paul David Johnson. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2023)
January 30, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Paul David Johnson. Appeal of Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #7 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2023)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying #6 Motion for Reconsideration. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
January 11, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Reconsideration re #4 Order Dismissing Case, #5 Judgment, filed by Paul David Johnson. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2023)
January 3, 2023 Filing 5 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 01/3/2023. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 01/3/2023. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
December 9, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Paul David Johnson. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2022)
December 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boise, R. Broomfield, Sanchez. Filed byPaul David Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Sanchez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul David Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Boise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Broomfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?