Escapex IP LLC v. Google LLC
Plaintiff: Escapex IP LLC
Defendant: Google LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv08711
Filed: December 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Alex G Tse
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Nellie F. Slayden. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2023)
January 18, 2023 Filing 34 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Nellie F. Slayden ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17907911.) filed by Google LLC. (Slayden, Nellie) (Filed on 1/18/2023)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Banner, Brian. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2023)
January 17, 2023 Filing 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17902319.) filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Banner, Brian) (Filed on 1/17/2023)
December 21, 2022 Filing 31 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for March 28, 2023, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by March 21st. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:22-cv-08711-HSG. The March 28th proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 12/21/2022. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
December 20, 2022 Filing 29 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2022)
December 20, 2022 Filing 28 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Google LLC.. (Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 12/20/2022)
December 20, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Asim M. Bhansali (Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 12/20/2022)
December 20, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Kate Ellis Lazarus (Lazarus, Kate) (Filed on 12/20/2022)
December 16, 2022 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff/Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/30/2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2022)
December 15, 2022 Filing 24 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/10/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2022)
December 15, 2022 Filing 23 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:22-cv-00428. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sm3)
December 8, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Non-Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue #18 and Status Report Under OGP 4.2 Section VI by Google LLC (Banner, Brian)
November 21, 2022 Filing 20 Sealed Document: Declaration of Umang Sharan of #18 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California by Google LLC (Banner, Brian)
November 21, 2022 Filing 19 Sealed Document: Declaration of Andreas Katsiapis of #18 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California by Google LLC (Banner, Brian)
November 21, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian C. Banner, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Proposed Order)(Banner, Brian)
October 17, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Google LLC.(Banner, Brian)
October 17, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Unopposed Extension to Respond to Second Amended Complaint by Google LLC (Banner, Brian)
September 29, 2022 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against Google LLC amending, filed by Escapex IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit US9009113)(Ramey, William)
September 16, 2022 Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #standing orders available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows:1. #Standing Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases,2. #Amended Standing Order On Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases. (bot4)
July 15, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tecuan Flores on behalf of Google LLC. Attorney Tecuan Flores added to party Google LLC(pty:dft) (Flores, Tecuan)
July 15, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Truman H Fenton on behalf of Google LLC. Attorney Truman H Fenton added to party Google LLC(pty:dft) (Fenton, Truman)
July 15, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darryl Adams on behalf of Google LLC. Attorney Darryl Adams added to party Google LLC(pty:dft) (Adams, Darryl)
July 5, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE JOINT NOTICE REGARDING DISMISSAL AND DISCOVERY OF PRE-SUIT INDIRECT INFRINGEMENT AND WILLFULNESS CLAIMS PURSUANT TO OGP 4.1 SEC. VII by Google LLC (Banner, Brian)
July 5, 2022 Filing 10 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google LLC identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc., Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google LLC. (Banner, Brian)
July 5, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Google LLC.(Banner, Brian)
May 23, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against Google LLC amending, filed by Escapex IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit US9009113)(Ramey, William)
May 11, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Google LLC answer due 7/5/2022. (sm3)
May 11, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE UNOPPOSED EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Google LLC (Banner, Brian)
May 9, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Christopher Banner on behalf of Google LLC. Attorney Brian Christopher Banner added to party Google LLC(pty:dft) (Banner, Brian)
May 3, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Escapex IP LLC. Google LLC served on 4/29/2022, answer due 5/20/2022. (Ramey, William)
April 28, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Google LLC. (sv)
April 28, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Escapex IP LLC. (Ramey, William)
April 28, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William)
April 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15977028), filed by Escapex IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit US9009113, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William)
April 28, 2022 All parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/
April 28, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (sv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Escapex IP LLC v. Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Escapex IP LLC
Represented By: Kyril Vladimir Talanov
Represented By: William P. Ramey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Darryl Adams
Represented By: Brian Christopher Banner
Represented By: Tecuan Flores
Represented By: Truman H Fenton
Represented By: Asim M. Bhansali
Represented By: Kate Ellis Lazarus
Represented By: Nellie Slayden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?