Moyer v. Chegg, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sheri Moyer
Defendant: Chegg, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2022cv09123
Filed: December 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING. YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that the hearing on the #16 Motion to Compel Arbitration, set for April 28, 2023 at 9:00 a.m., is VACATED. The Court will issue a written decision on the papers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2023)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY (re #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration And Dismiss Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b), Or Alternatively, Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration ) filed byChegg, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Wentao Xu In Support Of Defendant Chegg's Reply)(Romano, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/27/2023)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that the Case Management Conference, set for March 31, 2023 at 11:00 a.m., is VACATED. The Case Management Conference will be reset if necessary in the order resolving the pending motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2023)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sheri Moyer (Cole, Kevin) (Filed on 3/22/2023)
March 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration And Dismiss Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b), Or Alternatively, Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration ) filed bySheri Moyer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sheri Moyer, #2 Proposed Order)(Cole, Kevin) (Filed on 3/19/2023)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options By Parties And Counsel (Horstman, Raija) (Filed on 3/16/2023)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Tauler, Robert) (Filed on 3/15/2023)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2023)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration And Dismiss Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b), Or Alternatively, Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration filed by Chegg, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2023 09:00 AM before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 3/20/2023. Replies due by 3/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Chegg, Inc.s Motion To Compel Arbitration, #2 Declaration Of Wentao Xu In Support Of Defendant Chegg, Inc.s Motion To Compel Arbitration And Dismiss Proceedings Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) Or Alternatively, Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration; Exhibit A)(Romano, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/6/2023)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Raija Horstman (Horstman, Raija) (Filed on 1/18/2023)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chegg, Inc. (Horstman, Raija) (Filed on 1/18/2023)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Chegg, Inc.. (Horstman, Raija) (Filed on 1/18/2023)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Salzman Romano (Romano, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/18/2023)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheri Moyer. Chegg, Inc. served on 1/9/2023, answer due 1/30/2023. (Cole, Kevin) (Filed on 1/17/2023)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety using correct event "Summons Returned Executed" Re: #10 Certificate of Service fi led by Sheri Moyer (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2023)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sheri Moyer as to Summons and Complaint (Cole, Kevin) (Filed on 1/13/2023)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/11/2023. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/24/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/31/2023 11:00 AM - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsw Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent to the CRD at jswcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than March 30, 2023 at 12:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2023)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 1/11/2023 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2023)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #https://cand.uscourts.gov/notices/northern-district-extends-caseload-rebalancing-pilot-program/. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2023)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2023)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sheri Moyer.. (Cole, Kevin) (Filed on 1/10/2023)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/22/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2023 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Chegg, Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/10/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2022)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Class Action COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17854508). Filed by Sheri Moyer. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit CLRA Venue Affidavit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Cole, Kevin) (Filed on 12/27/2022) Modified on 12/28/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moyer v. Chegg, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri Moyer
Represented By: Kevin Jason Cole
Represented By: Robert Tauler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chegg, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Salzman Romano
Represented By: Raija Horstman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?