ByteDance Inc. et al v. Advanced Coding Technologies LLC et al
Plaintiff: ByteDance Inc. and Tiktok Inc.
Defendant: Advanced Coding Technologies LLC, Anjay Technology Partners LLC, Anjay Venture Partners LLC and Deepak Sharma
Case Number: 4:2023cv01412
Filed: March 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2023 Filing 35 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE DOCKET NO. #34 . Your address on the application does not match the address listed on the docket. Either update your address on the docket or e-file a revised application (with attachments) with the correct address reflected on it. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2023)
May 12, 2023 Filing 34 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18260172.) filed by Advanced Coding Technologies LLC, Anjay Technology Partners LLC, Anjay Venture Partners LLC, Deepak Sharma. (Mercadante, Joseph) (Filed on 5/12/2023)
May 12, 2023 Filing 33 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE DOCKET NO. #30 . Your address on the application does not match the address listed on the docket. Either update your address on the docket or e-file a revised application (with attachments) with the correct address reflected on it. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2023)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Lambrianakos, Peter. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2023)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Fabricant, Alfred. *Docket No. 26 Terminated, Re-filed as Docket No. #28 .* (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2023)
May 12, 2023 Filing 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18259011.) filed by Advanced Coding Technologies LLC, Anjay Technology Partners LLC, Anjay Venture Partners LLC, Deepak Sharma. (Rubino, Vincent) (Filed on 5/12/2023)
May 12, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18259002.) filed by Advanced Coding Technologies LLC, Anjay Technology Partners LLC, Anjay Venture Partners LLC, Deepak Sharma. (Lambrianakos, Peter) (Filed on 5/12/2023)
May 12, 2023 Filing 28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18257336.) Filing fee previously paid on 5/11/23 filed by Advanced Coding Technologies LLC, Anjay Technology Partners LLC, Anjay Venture Partners LLC, Deepak Sharma. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Filed on 5/12/2023)
May 12, 2023 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE DOCKET NO. #26 . Please re-file your pro hac vice application and the attachments in its entirety. Please make sure you and your local co-counsel's complete addresses are visible on the application. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2023)
May 11, 2023 Filing 26 *DISREGARD, RE-FILED AS DOCKET NO. #28 .* MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18257336.) filed by Advanced Coding Technologies LLC, Anjay Technology Partners LLC, Anjay Venture Partners LLC, Deepak Sharma. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Filed on 5/11/2023) Modified on 5/12/2023 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Bonilla, Ricardo. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2023)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Kessel, Adam. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2023)
April 13, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18168806.) filed by ByteDance Inc., Tiktok Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bonilla, Ricardo) (Filed on 4/13/2023)
April 13, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18168491.) filed by ByteDance Inc., Tiktok Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kessel, Adam) (Filed on 4/13/2023)
April 13, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanel Nicole Sunga (Sunga, Jeanel) (Filed on 4/13/2023)
April 12, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Minna Y. Chan (Chan, Minna) (Filed on 4/12/2023)
April 12, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin T. Wang (Wang, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/12/2023)
April 12, 2023 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Case Management Statement due by 6/20/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2023 02:00 PM. The 6/27/2023 proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(eac, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2023)
April 11, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by ByteDance Inc., Tiktok Inc. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 4/11/2023)
April 11, 2023 Filing 16 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to initial Complaint for Declaratory Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 8,615,154; 9,313,244; AND 9,445,041 filed by ByteDance Inc., Tiktok Inc., Advanced Coding Technologies LLC, Anjay Technology Partners LLC, Anjay Venture Partners LLC, and Deepak Sharma. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 4/11/2023) Modified on 4/12/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 4/11/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2023)
April 11, 2023 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2023)
April 10, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ByteDance Inc., Tiktok Inc.. Deepak Sharma served on 4/3/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 4/10/2023)
April 10, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ByteDance Inc., Tiktok Inc.. Anjay Venture Partners LLC served on 4/3/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 4/10/2023)
April 10, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ByteDance Inc., Tiktok Inc.. Anjay Technology Partners LLC served on 3/31/2023, answer due 4/21/2023. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 4/10/2023)
April 10, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ByteDance Inc., Tiktok Inc.. Advanced Coding Technologies LLC served on 3/31/2023, answer due 4/21/2023. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 4/10/2023)
April 10, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ByteDance Inc., Tiktok Inc... (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 4/10/2023)
March 29, 2023 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ByteDance Inc., Tiktok Inc. identifying Corporate Parent TikTok LLC for Tiktok Inc.; Corporate Parent ByteDance Ltd. for ByteDance Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 3/29/2023)
March 28, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Advanced Coding Technologies LLC, Anjay Technology Partners LLC, Anjay Venture Partners LLC, Deepak Sharma. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2023)
March 27, 2023 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 3/27/2023)
March 27, 2023 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/16/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2023)
March 27, 2023 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/10/2023. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2023)
March 27, 2023 #Electronic filing error. A maximum of THREE summons will be issued. Please list all defendants on ONE summons or multiple defendants on THREE summons and re-file in its entirety. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Tiktok Inc., ByteDance Inc. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2023)
March 24, 2023 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patents (cc: form mailed to register). (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 3/24/2023)
March 24, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 3/24/2023)
March 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 8,615,154; 9,313,244; and 9,445,041 against Advanced Coding Technologies LLC, Anjay Technology Partners LLC, Anjay Venture Partners LLC, Deepak Sharma with jury demand ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18108354.). Filed by ByteDance Inc., Tiktok Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 3/24/2023) Modified on 3/27/2023 (jml, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ByteDance Inc. et al v. Advanced Coding Technologies LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ByteDance Inc.
Represented By: Michael Richard Headley
Represented By: Jeanel Nicole Sunga
Represented By: Adam J Kessel
Represented By: Ricardo J. Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiktok Inc.
Represented By: Michael Richard Headley
Represented By: Adam J Kessel
Represented By: Jeanel Nicole Sunga
Represented By: Ricardo J. Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Coding Technologies LLC
Represented By: Benjamin T. Wang
Represented By: Minna Y. Chan
Represented By: Alfred Ross Fabricant
Represented By: Peter Lambrianakos
Represented By: Vincent Joseph Rubino, III
Represented By: Joseph Mercadante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anjay Technology Partners LLC
Represented By: Benjamin T. Wang
Represented By: Minna Y. Chan
Represented By: Alfred Ross Fabricant
Represented By: Joseph Mercadante
Represented By: Peter Lambrianakos
Represented By: Vincent Joseph Rubino, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anjay Venture Partners LLC
Represented By: Benjamin T. Wang
Represented By: Minna Y. Chan
Represented By: Joseph Mercadante
Represented By: Alfred Ross Fabricant
Represented By: Peter Lambrianakos
Represented By: Vincent Joseph Rubino, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deepak Sharma
Represented By: Benjamin T. Wang
Represented By: Minna Y. Chan
Represented By: Alfred Ross Fabricant
Represented By: Joseph Mercadante
Represented By: Peter Lambrianakos
Represented By: Vincent Joseph Rubino, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?