Anaya Samano v. Oportun, Inc.
Plaintiff: Josue Anaya Samano
Defendant: Opportun Inc and Oportun, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2023cv02886
Filed: June 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2023 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Josue Anaya Samano.. (Ingber, Jason) (Filed on 7/27/2023)
July 27, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Oportun, Inc... (Johnson, Timothy) (Filed on 7/27/2023)
July 13, 2023 Filing 8 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/27/2023. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2023)
July 11, 2023 Filing 7 STIPULATION to extend time to respond to complaint filed by Oportun, Inc.. (Johnson, Timothy) (Filed on 7/11/2023)
June 28, 2023 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/12/2023. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2023)
June 14, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Opportun Inc. (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2023)
June 13, 2023 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, To be determined. (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2023)
June 13, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/27/2023. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2023)
June 12, 2023 Filing 2 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Josue Anaya Samano. Amendment to #1 Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Summons Amended, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Amended)(Ingber, Jason) (Filed on 6/12/2023)
June 12, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Opportun Inc ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BCANDC-18353133.). Filed byJosue Anaya Samano. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ingber, Jason) (Filed on 6/12/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anaya Samano v. Oportun, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josue Anaya Samano
Represented By: Jason M Ingber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opportun Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oportun, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Peter Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?