Board of Education Harford County v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Board of Education Harford County
Defendant: Meta Platforms Inc., Facebook Payments, Inc., Siculus Inc, Facebook Operations, LLC, Instagram, LLC., Snap Inc., Tiktok Inc., TikTok Ltd, TikTok LLC, Bytedance Ltd, ByteDance Inc., Google LLC and YouTube LLC
Case Number: 4:2023cv03065
Filed: June 21, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2023 MEMBER CASE OPENED: District of Maryland, 1:23-cv-01467, Board of Education Hartford County v, Meta Platforms, Inc., Opened in California Northern District as 23-cv-03065 YGR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order CTO -12 cc: JPMDL (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2023)
June 21, 2023 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 1:23-cv-01467. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 21, 2023 Filing 6 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 21, 2023 Remark: case electronically transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of California. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 16, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to ByteDance, Inc., Bytedance, LTD., Facebook Operations, LLC,, Facebook Payments Inc., Google, LLC, Instagram, LLC., Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc., Snap, Inc., TikTok, Inc., TikTok, LLC, TikTok, LTD., YouTube, LLC.(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE by Board of Education Harford County Summons Proposed Summons to Meta Platforms, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proposed Summons to Bytedance, Inc., #2 Summons Proposed Summons to Bytedance, Ltd., #3 Summons Proposed Summons to Facebook Operators, LLC, #4 Summons Proposed Summons to Facebook Payments, Inc., #5 Summons Proposed Summons to Google, LLC, #6 Summons Proposed Summons to Instagram, LLC, #7 Summons Proposed Summons to Siculus, Inc., #8 Summons Proposed Summons to Snap Inc., #9 Summons Proposed Summons to TikTok, Inc., #10 Summons Proposed Summons to TikTok, LLC, #11 Summons Proposed Summons to Youtube LLC, #12 Summons Proposed Summons to TikTok, Ltd.)(Legg, Matthew)
June 8, 2023 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Board of Education Harford County (Legg, Matthew)
June 2, 2023 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Board of Education Harford County was filed incorrectly. Summons provided with complaint were incomplete with no service address. Please resubmit complete summons using the event Notice (other) and link it to #1 Complaint. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 2, 2023 Deficiency Notice -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 6/9/2023 (heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10630981.), filed by Board of Education Harford County. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summons to Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc., #3 Summons Proposed Summons to Defendant Facebook Payments, Inc., #4 Summons Proposed Summons to Defendant Instagram, LLC Siculus, Inc., #5 Summons Proposed Summons to Defendant Facebook Operations, LLC, #6 Summons Proposed Summons to Defendant Instagram, LLC, #7 Summons Proposed Summons to Defendant Snap, Inc., #8 Summons Proposed Summons to Defendant TikTok Inc., #9 Summons Proposed Summons to Defendant TikTok, Ltd., #10 Summons Proposed Summons to Defendant TikTok, LLC, #11 Summons Proposed Summons to Defendant ByteDance, Ltd., #12 Summons Proposed Summons to Defendant ByteDance Inc., #13 Summons Proposed Summons to Defendant Google LLC, #14 Summons Proposed Summons to Defendant YouTube, LLC)(Federico, Philip)
June 1, 2023 Case Assigned to Chief Judge James K. Bredar. (kos, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Education Harford County v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Education Harford County
Represented By: Brent Patrick Ceryes
Represented By: Jason L. Lichtman
Represented By: Matthew Porter Legg
Represented By: Philip C. Federico
Represented By: Kelly K. McNabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Platforms Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Payments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siculus Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Operations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Instagram, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snap Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiktok Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TikTok Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TikTok LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bytedance Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ByteDance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?