Hilburn v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Jaimee Pua Hilburn
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security, Kilolo Kijakazi and SSA (INTERESTED PARTY / NEF)
Case Number: 4:2023cv04668
Filed: September 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kilolo Kijakazi.. (Gonzalez de Llano, Oscar) (Filed on 10/17/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jaimee Pua Hilburn.. (Barasch, Stuart) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 7 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/26/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
September 27, 2023 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/11/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2023)
September 13, 2023 Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2023)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed on 9/13/2023.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2023)
September 12, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/26/2023. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2023)
September 12, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jaimee Pua Hilburn. (Barasch, Stuart) (Filed on 9/12/2023)
September 12, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Review of a Social Security Decision against Commissioner of Social Security. Filed byJaimee Pua Hilburn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Barasch, Stuart) (Filed on 9/12/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hilburn v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaimee Pua Hilburn
Represented By: Stuart T. Barasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Oscar Gonzalez de Llano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSA (INTERESTED PARTY / NEF)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?