Kagan v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Victor Kagan
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi and SSA (INTERESTED PARTY / NEF)
Case Number: 4:2023cv04886
Filed: September 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2023 Filing 13 SSA Administrative Transcript Notice of Lodging Transcript of the Certified Administrative Record in Electronic Form by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: #1 Part 1, #2 Part 2, #3 Part 3, #4 Part 4, #5 Part 5, #6 Part 6, #7 Part 7, #8 Part 8, #9 Part 9, #10 Part 10, #11 Part 11, #12 Part 12, #13 Part 13, #14 Part 14)(Lo, Michelle) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 8, 2023 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2023)
November 7, 2023 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. (Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 11/7/2023)
November 7, 2023 Filing 10 FEE PAID (Filing fee$402,receipt number ACANDC-18816332). (Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 11/7/2023)
October 30, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Victor Kagan.. (Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 10/30/2023)
October 27, 2023 Filing 8 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/13/2023. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kilolo Kijakazi.. (Highland, Erin) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/26/2023. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2023)
September 25, 2023 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2023)
September 25, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/10/2023. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2023)
September 25, 2023 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Victor Kagan. (Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 9/25/2023)
September 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Judicial Review of Decision of Commissioner of Social Security against Kilolo Kijakazi. Filed byVictor Kagan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 9/25/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kagan v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Kagan
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Erin Highland
Represented By: Michelle Lo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSA (INTERESTED PARTY / NEF)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?