Frazier v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Kalien Frazier
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association and DOES 1 to 100, inclusive
Case Number: 4:2023cv05675
Filed: November 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2023 Filing 12 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Case Management Statement due by 2/6/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A combined list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than February 12, 2024 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 2/6/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2023)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to case, Correction of category/nature of suit. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 11/16/23. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2023)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 11/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2023)
November 13, 2023 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2023)
November 10, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Bank National Association.. (Woodhead, Emilie) (Filed on 11/10/2023)
November 7, 2023 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by U.S. Bank National Association re #1 Notice of Removal,, and Initiating Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice to Clerk re Removal, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to Adverse Party)(Tucker Fife, Joan) (Filed on 11/7/2023)
November 6, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Cassandra Ariana Castro (Castro, Cassandra) (Filed on 11/6/2023)
November 3, 2023 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 1/25/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2023)
November 3, 2023 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/17/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2023)
November 3, 2023 Answer to Removal Complaint (See Removal #1 Exhibt B) by U.S. Bank National Association. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2023)
November 2, 2023 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by U.S. Bank National Association (Tucker Fife, Joan) (Filed on 11/2/2023)
November 2, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Bank National Association identifying Other Affiliate U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association. (Tucker Fife, Joan) (Filed on 11/2/2023)
November 2, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18802497) from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is 23CV042876. (). Filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - USB Defendant's Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Civil Case Cover Sheet (Alameda Superior Court), #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Case Management Conference, #5 Exhibit E - Alameda County ADR Information Packet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tucker Fife, Joan) (Filed on 11/2/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frazier v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalien Frazier
Represented By: Joseph Lavi
Represented By: Cassandra Ariana Castro
Represented By: Vincent Charles Granberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Joan B. Tucker Fife
Represented By: Emilie Consuelo Woodhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?