Stanley v. CDCR et al
Plaintiff: Mark Stanley
Defendant: CDCR, San Quentin State Prison, R. Broomfield, Acting Warden Ronald Broomfield, Ralph Diaz, Kathaleen Allison, Warden Ron Davis, Captain J. Arnold, Warden Dean Borders and Director Joseph Bink
Case Number: 4:2024cv00013
Filed: January 2, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
2 Judge: PSLC SJT
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2024 Filing 16 Letter from Mark A. Stanley-Bey regarding proof of service of summons. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2024)
January 29, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Mark Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2024)
January 29, 2024 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mark Stanley. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2024)
January 17, 2024 Filing 13 Refund Status re #8 Application for Refund Approved. (rgh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2024)
January 16, 2024 Filing 12 Letter from Mark Stanley re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2024)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
January 12, 2024 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
January 12, 2024 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ronald Broomfield, CDCR, San Quentin State Prison.. (Desta, Zewugeberhan) (Filed on 1/12/2024)
January 10, 2024 Filing 8 Application for Refund, Receipt Number ACANDC-18982718 by Ronald Broomfield, CDCR, San Quentin State Prison. (Desta, Zewugeberhan) (Filed on 1/10/2024)
January 9, 2024 Filing 7 FEE PAID (Filing fee$405,receipt number ACANDC-19004310). (Desta, Zewugeberhan) (Filed on 1/9/2024)
January 8, 2024 Filing 6 AMENDED NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT of Filing Fee re 5 Please be advised that the filing fee has not been received in this case in the amount of $405.00. The fee must be paid within two business days or the case will be subject to termination. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2024) M
January 8, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT of Filing Fee . Please be advised that the filing fee has not been received in this case in the amount of $402.00. The fee must be paid within two business days or the case will be subject to termination. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2024) Modified on 1/8/2024 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
January 5, 2024 REMARK: Sent Notice #4 of Assignment of Prisoner Case to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial to plaintiff at SQSP via prison email filing.(ljf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2024)
January 2, 2024 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2024) Modified on 1/4/2024 (ljf, COURT STAFF).
January 2, 2024 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by R. Broomfield, CDCR, San Quentin State Prison . (Desta, Zewugeberhan) (Filed on 1/2/2024)
January 2, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marin County Superior Court. Their case number is CV0001060. (). Filed by CDCR, R. Broomfield, San Quentin State Prison. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion that the Court Screen Plaintiff's Complaint Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1915A; Wavier of Reply Under 42 U.S.C. Section 1997e(g), #2 Demand for Jury Trial)(Desta, Zewugeberhan) (Filed on 1/2/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanley v. CDCR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR
Represented By: Zewugeberhan Zegeye Desta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Quentin State Prison
Represented By: Zewugeberhan Zegeye Desta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Broomfield
Represented By: Zewugeberhan Zegeye Desta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Warden Ronald Broomfield
Represented By: Zewugeberhan Zegeye Desta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathaleen Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Ron Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain J. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Dean Borders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Joseph Bink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?