Newman et al v. Weingarten et al
Plaintiff: Joel Newman
Defendant: Tomer Weingarten, David Bernhardt, Charlene T. Begley, Aaron Hughes, Mark S. Peek, Ana G. Pinczuk, Daniel Scheinmann, Teddi Wardi, Jeffrey W. Yabuki and SentinelOne, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2024cv01934
Filed: March 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING A TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Telephonic Case Management Conference has been set for August 13, 2024, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by August 6th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:24-cv-01934-HSG. The August 13, 2024 proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys and pro se litigants appearing for a telephonic case management conference are required to dial-in at least 15 minutes before the hearing to check-in with the CRD. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2024)
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Jon S. Tigar no longer assigned to case. Signed by The Clerk on 5/6/2024. (wsm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2024) .
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RELATED CASE ORDER RE CASE NO. 23-cv-2786-HSG. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/3/2024. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2024)
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Case Management Statement due by 8/6/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A combined list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than August 12, 2024 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 8/6/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2024)
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 05/02/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2024)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/1/2024. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2024)
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 4/30/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2024)
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joel Newman.. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 4/30/2024)
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2024)
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Charlene T. Begley, David Bernhardt, Aaron Hughes, Mark S. Peek, Ana G. Pinczuk, Daniel Scheinmann, SentinelOne, Inc., Teddi Wardi, Tomer Weingarten, Jeffrey W. Yabuki.. (Pomerantz, Jay) (Filed on 4/30/2024)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/30/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2024)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay L. Pomerantz on behalf of Defendants Tomer Weingarten, David Bernhardt, Charlene T. Begley, Aaron Hughes, Mark S. Peek, Ana G. Pinczuk, Daniel Scheinman, Teddie Wardi, Jeffrey W. Yabuki, and Nominal Defendant SentinelOne, Inc. (Pomerantz, Jay) (Filed on 4/19/2024)
April 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/30/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2024)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Charlene T. Begley, David Bernhardt, Aaron Hughes, Mark S. Peek, Ana G. Pinczuk, Daniel Scheinmann, Teddi Wardi, Tomer Weingarten, Jeffrey W. Yabuki. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2024)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/20/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2024 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - To be held by Zoom. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2024)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet by Joel Newman (corrected version). (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 3/29/2024)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Joel Newman (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 3/29/2024)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/12/2024. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2024)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 3/29/2024)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19271765.). Filed by Joel Newman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 3/29/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newman et al v. Weingarten et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Newman
Represented By: Betsy Carol Manifold
Represented By: Alex J. Tramontano
Represented By: Ferdeza Zekiri
Represented By: Rachele R. Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomer Weingarten
Represented By: Jay L. Pomerantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Represented By: Jay L. Pomerantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlene T. Begley
Represented By: Jay L. Pomerantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Hughes
Represented By: Jay L. Pomerantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark S. Peek
Represented By: Jay L. Pomerantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana G. Pinczuk
Represented By: Jay L. Pomerantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Scheinmann
Represented By: Jay L. Pomerantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teddi Wardi
Represented By: Jay L. Pomerantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey W. Yabuki
Represented By: Jay L. Pomerantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SentinelOne, Inc.
Represented By: Jay L. Pomerantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?