Phelps v. Brassard
Plaintiff: Briggett Charmain Phelps
Defendant: Monique Brassard, Mike Byers, Dave Linsie, Darris Atkins, San Rafael Housing Authority and Marshal & Company
Case Number: 4:2024cv02354
Filed: April 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Referring Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2024 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Briggett Charmain Phelps.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2024)
May 28, 2024 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Briggett Charmain Phelps.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2024)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 24, 2024 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: #1 Complaint filed by Briggett Charmain Phelps, ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Objections due by 6/7/2024. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/24/2024. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 21, 2024 Filing 6 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/4/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 6, 2024 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/20/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING #3 PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: Plaintiff must pay the filing fee of $405.00 in full by no later than 5/21/2024. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/23/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 22, 2024 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 19, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Briggett Charmain Phelps. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2024)
April 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monique Brassard. Filed by Briggett Charmain Phelps. Consent/Declination due by 5/3/2024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phelps v. Brassard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Briggett Charmain Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monique Brassard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Linsie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darris Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Rafael Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshal & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?