Coulter v. Dropbox, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ramsey Coulter
Defendant: Dropbox, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2024cv02637
Filed: May 2, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Referring Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RELATED CASE ORDER. Case 24-cv-02637-JSW is related to cases 24-cv-02659-MMC, 24-cv-02731-JD, 24-cv-02794-JSC. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/27/2024. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2024)
June 11, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE by Ramsey Coulter (Zemel, Daniel) (Filed on 6/11/2024)
June 5, 2024 Filing 18 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by Dropbox, Inc.. Responses due by 6/10/2024. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Isaac D. Chaput, #2 Proposed Order)(Chaput, Isaac) (Filed on 6/5/2024)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying #16 Stipulation. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2024)
June 3, 2024 Filing 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS AND SET SCHEDULING DEADLINES filed by Dropbox, Inc.. (Chaput, Isaac) (Filed on 6/3/2024)
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/31/2024. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/2/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2024 11:00 AM - Videoconference Only. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2024)
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 5/31/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2024)
May 30, 2024 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2024)
May 30, 2024 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Dropbox, Inc... (Chaput, Isaac) (Filed on 5/30/2024)
May 30, 2024 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dropbox, Inc. (Chaput, Isaac) (Filed on 5/30/2024)
May 30, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Quinn Verdin (Verdin, Matthew) (Filed on 5/30/2024)
May 30, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Isaac Daniel Chaput (Chaput, Isaac) (Filed on 5/30/2024)
May 30, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Louise Rodgers (Rodgers, Megan) (Filed on 5/30/2024)
May 29, 2024 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/12/2024. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2024)
May 19, 2024 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/30/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2024)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel Zemel. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2024)
May 16, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19422243.) filed by Ramsey Coulter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Zemel, Daniel) (Filed on 5/16/2024)
May 2, 2024 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/16/2024. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2024)
May 2, 2024 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Ramsey Coulter . (Sibilia, Robert) (Filed on 5/2/2024)
May 2, 2024 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Demand for Jury Trial against Dropbox, Inc. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19379360.). Filed by Ramsey Coulter. (Sibilia, Robert) (Filed on 5/2/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coulter v. Dropbox, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramsey Coulter
Represented By: Robert Sibilia
Represented By: Daniel Zemel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dropbox, Inc.
Represented By: Isaac Daniel Chaput
Represented By: Matthew Quinn Verdin
Represented By: Megan Louise Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?